Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Noelle C Collins
Case #: 4:23-cv-00164
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:Jun 01, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 4:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange
Plaintiff
Amela Caus
Law Offices of Michael C. Seamands, LLC 1401 S. Brentwood Blvd Suite 825
St. Louis, MO 63144
Represented By
Michael C. Seamands
Law Offices Of Michael C Seamands LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Thu 06/01 10:19 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/31/2023. (KXS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/31 7:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amela Caus (Seamands, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 05/23 8:17 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Amela Caus. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Seamands, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Mon 05/22 3:26 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Amela Caus. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 05/17 3:40 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file the answer or a motion for extension of time on or before June 1, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall inform Defendant of this correction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 5/17/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/17 6:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Amela Caus. Automobile Club Inter-Insurance Exchange served on 5/11/2023. (Seamands, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/16 2:34 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), Plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of timely service. (Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 5/16/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
4 4 2 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 05/15 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF REJECTION OF SERVICE (TMT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Tue 02/14 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Amela Caus Process Server: John Houseman (JDC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/14 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Automobile Club Inter Insurance Exchange with receipt number AMOEDC-9781914, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Amela Caus.(Seamands, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 2 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons Summons (AAA Director of Insurance),
Att: 5 Summons Summons (Reg Agent)
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 02/14 1:50 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Michael C. Seamands. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JDC)
Related: [-]
misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Tue 02/14 6:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
Related: [-]