Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Tanya Walton Pratt
Referred: Kellie M Barr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00022
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:May 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 6:34 AM EDT
Defendant
FREEDOMPOINT, LLC
Represented By
Alyssa C.B. Cochran
Kightlinger & Gray, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By
Louis T. Perry
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath Llp (indianapolis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2023 6:52 PM EST
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
1 1 27 pgs COMPLAINT against FREEDOMPOINT, LLC, filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7504850)(Perry, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Freedom Mortgage Marks,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Roundpoint Registrations,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T. Perry on behalf of Plaintiff FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Perry, Louis)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Perry, Louis)
Related: [-]