South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:23-cv-00626
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC
Represented By
Emily Collins Brown
Barnes Alford Stork And Johnson
contact info
Defendant
Austin McCrea, DO
Defendant
Lane I Moore, MD
Represented By
Kelli Elizabeth M Goldstein
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Defendant
Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC
Represented By
Kelli Elizabeth M Goldstein
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr
Copeland Stair Valz And Lovell
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Baird Roberts
Represented By
John Eric Fulda
Whetstone Perkins And Fulda LLC
contact info
Cheryl F Perkins
Whetstone Perkins And Fulda LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 07, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Thu 11/07 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr for Jan. 13 through Jan. 17, 2025 and May 19 through May 23, 2025 (Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/13 11:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC, Austin McCrea, DO. (Johnson, Weldon)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
30 30 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 09/09 12:22 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC.(Goldstein, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
29 29 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 06/10 3:29 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Linda Baird Roberts.(Fulda, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
28 28 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 3:02 PM
FOURTH AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/10/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/9/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/9/2024, Discovery due by 12/9/2024, Motions due by 1/6/2025, Mediation Due by 12/5/2024, No later than thirty (30) days before the date set for jury selection, the parties shall file and exchange Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures; Motions in Limine: Motions in limine must be filed no later than thirty (30) days before the date set for trial. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after January 13, 2025. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/11/24. (swel, )
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 03/11 2:55 PM
TEXT ORDER granting consent 26 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/11/24.(swel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
26 26 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/07 11:59 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Scheduling Order, by Linda Baird Roberts. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Fulda, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Fourth Amended Scheduling Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Thu 02/15 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Kelli Elizabeth M Goldstein for Feb.23,2024; March 1 thru 4, 2024; March 20 thru March 22, 2024; April 17 thru April 22, 2024 (Goldstein, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
24 24 order Confidentiality Order Mon 01/08 2:52 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 1/8/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order Mon 01/08 2:47 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 1/8/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
22 22 motion Confidentiality Order Fri 01/05 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order with Proposed Confidentiality Order by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/19/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Goldstein, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/08 2:03 PM
THIRD AMENDED CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/8/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/7/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/7/2024, Discovery due by 9/10/2024, Motions due by 10/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 10/14/2024, Mediation Due by 9/6/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 12/8/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 12/08 1:57 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 19 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 12/8/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
19 19 motion Amend/Correct Thu 12/07 11:03 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct18 Scheduling Order, by Linda Baird Roberts. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Fulda, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Scheduling Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/12 4:54 PM
SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/8/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/8/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/8/2023, Discovery due by 6/10/2024, Motions due by 7/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 10/14/2024, Mediation Due by 6/6/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 10/12/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 10/12 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER granting consent 16 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 10/12/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/06 1:13 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Scheduling Order, by Linda Baird Roberts. Response to Motion due by 10/20/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Fulda, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Mon 08/28 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr for October 2 through October 6, 2023 and October 16 through October 20, 2023 (Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Wed 04/05 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Dennis Gary Lovell, Jr for October 9, 2023 through October 13, 2023 (Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/04 9:08 AM
AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/6/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/6/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/6/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/6/2023, Discovery due by 3/6/2024, Motions due by 4/6/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 7/15/2024, Mediation Due by 3/6/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 4/4/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
12 12 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Thu 03/30 11:15 AM
Joint Discovery Plan Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Rule 26(f) Report Thu 03/30 11:14 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents (proposed) Amended Scheduling Order
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/29 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelli Elizabeth M Goldstein on behalf of Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC (Goldstein, Kelli)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/09 9:45 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/30/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/13/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 4/13/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/4/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/5/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/5/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/5/2023, Discovery due by 9/5/2023, Motions due by 10/5/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 1/3/2024, Mediation Due by 9/5/2023. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 3/9/2023. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 03/08 2:51 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC, Austin McCrea, DO.(Brown, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/08 2:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC.(Brown, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
6 6 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/07 6:00 PM
Defendants' Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/07 5:59 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC.(Lovell, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC, Austin McCrea, DO, Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC. Service due by 5/15/2023. (hcic, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/14 3:36 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Linda Baird Roberts.(hcic, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/14 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Grand Strand Regional Medical Center LLC, Austin McCrea, DO, Lane I Moore, MD, Surgical Associates of Myrtle Beach LLC (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10944420), filed by Linda Baird Roberts. (hcic, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Expert Affidavit