California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 2:23-cv-01119
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 3:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Alex Weingarten
Plaintiff
Antares Underwriting Limited
Represented By
Michelle R Press
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman And Dicker LLP
contact info
Brian Otis Felder
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman And Dicker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
20 20 order Dismissing Case Tue 08/15 1:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION19 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court has been advised that this action has been settled. The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
19 19 notice Settlement Fri 08/11 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited. (Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 07/21 4:36 PM
ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE PENDING AUGUST 2023 MEDIATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation17 , the time for Defendant Alex Weingarten to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is further EXTENDED until 9/1/2023. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 07/19 6:08 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Sept. 1, 2023 re Order,, Order Extending Answer Due Deadline,16 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),12 , Stipulation to Continue,15 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited.(Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 26, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 05/26 5:18 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE PENDING 7/12/2023 MEDIATION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation15 , the deadline for Defendant Alex Weingarten to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to 7/21/2023. The Order to Show Cause14 is discharged. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
15 15 stip Continue Wed 05/24 7:28 PM
Second STIPULATION to Continue Defendant's Response from 5/12/2023 to 7/21/2023 Re: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),12 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,14 filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited.(Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Felder in Support of Stipulation,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendant to Respond until After July 12, 2023 Mediation
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
14 14 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/17 3:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The below time period(s) has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before May 24, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (lom) Modified on 5/17/2023 (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 05/01 10:30 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On April 17, 2023, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on April 28, 2023. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 04/28 2:50 AM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex Weingarten answer now due 5/12/2023, re Order to Show Cause,11 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),10 filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited.(Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/17 4:29 PM
MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before May 1, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 03/28 10:33 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited, upon Defendant Alex Weingarten served on 3/23/2023, answer due 4/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sabrina Shelton, Security Guard at Defendant's business address in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy as provided by included Declaration of Mailing (Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/17 9:31 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/16 9:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Alex Weingarten. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 02/16 9:43 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 02/16 9:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 02/16 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/15 2:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited (Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 02/14 8:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited. (Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 02/14 8:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited. (Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/14 8:17 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34798640 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Antares Underwriting Limited. (Attorney Brian Otis Felder added to party Antares Underwriting Limited(pty:pla))(Felder, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (The Lloyd's Policy),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Application)