Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-00630
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:23-cv-00116
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 2:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Aitkens
Represented By
Randi A. Kassan
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, March 02, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 03/02 1:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Christopher Aitkens] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 03/02 1:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Christopher Aitkens] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/02 1:10 PM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Christopher Aitkens] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 02/14 3:23 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-00116. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 02/14 3:26 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri, 4:23-cv-00116, Christopher Aitkens v. Mosanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-00630 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order4 cc: JPMDL (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
5 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER (CTO-379) to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by John Nicols on 2/13/2023. (JBH)
Related: [-]
4 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-379) regarding MDL 2741 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by John W. Nicols on 2/13/2023. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
3 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Christopher Aitkens. (Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Christopher Aitkens (Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-9757574, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Christopher Aitkens.(Kassan, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Randi A. Kassan. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JDC)
Related: [-]