Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:23-cv-10397
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 28, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Arjuna Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Sean Hennessy
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan S. Bolton
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Stuart M. Schwartz
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
25 25 garnish Answer to Continuing Garnishment Wed 10/11 2:03 PM
ANSWER to Continuing Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. as to Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. (TTho)
Related: [-]
24 24 garnish Answer to Continuing Garnishment Wed 10/11 1:45 PM
ANSWER to Continuing Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA as to Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
21 21 petition Request - other Wed 09/06 2:30 PM
REQUEST and Writ for Garnishment to the First Republic Bank by Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
20 20 petition Request - other Mon 08/28 2:53 PM
REQUEST and Writ for Garnishment to the American Cancer Society by Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
19 19 order Judgment - Consent Fri 07/28 9:41 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
18 18 order Stipulation and Order Thu 06/22 9:43 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests to Defendant. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/27 10:11 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 8/11/2023, Expert Discovery due by 11/13/2023, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/15/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2024 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman, Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. Related [+] (HRya)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
16 16 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Wed 04/26 2:25 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Schwartz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 04/26 2:51 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Video Scheduling Conference on 5/3/2023 is Cancelled re12 Order to Appear. The Court will issue a scheduling order pursuant to the Joint Discovery Plan. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/24 6:21 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. (Hennessy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
14 14 order Vacating Show Cause* Mon 04/17 10:28 AM
Order Vacating6 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
13 13 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Wed 04/12 10:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Airfoil Public Relations, Inc. against Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Bolton, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Consulting Services Agreement and Amendment,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Account Stated
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
12 12 notice Appear* Tue 04/04 12:46 PM
ORDER TO ATTEND VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN: Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE AND ZOOM LINK** (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
11 11 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 04/03 6:39 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arjuna Solutions, Inc. (Hennessy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/03 6:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. (Hennessy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
9 9 order Extend Time to - Free Vacating Show Cause* Fri 03/31 11:50 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint and Vacating Order to Show Cause. ( Response due by 4/3/2023. ) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
8 8 notice Change of Address/Contact Information Thu 03/30 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Stuart M. Schwartz on behalf of Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Change of Address/Contact Information Thu 03/30 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jordan S. Bolton on behalf of Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.. (Bolton, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
6 6 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Tue 03/28 11:18 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2023. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 03/20 5:38 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher Sean Hennessy appearing on behalf of Arjuna Solutions, Inc. (Hennessy, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/20 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Arjuna Solutions, Inc. served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (Bolton, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 02/16 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Arjuna Solutions, Inc.* (KBro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 02/16 12:57 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (KBro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 02/15 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart M. Schwartz on behalf of Airfoil Public Relations, Inc.. (Schwartz, Stuart)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 02/15 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Airfoil Public Relations, Inc. against Arjuna Solutions, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-9237666 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Bolton, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Services Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Account Stated