Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Jorge L Alonso
Referred: Jeffrey Cole
Case #: 1:23-cv-00927
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2023
Case in other court:The Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, 2023CH00324
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 5:46 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
TRP Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline Pritikin
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Ann Addis Pantoga
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Emily Louise Peel
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Masiel Rodriguez
Represented By
Michael William Drew
Neighborhood Legal, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rozlin Financial Group, Inc
Represented By
Nicole Marie Strickler
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Stephanie Anne Strickler
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Luke Chamberlain
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
TRP Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline Pritikin
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Ann Addis Pantoga
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Emily Louise Peel
Thompson Coburn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Masiel Rodriguez
Represented By
Michael William Drew
Neighborhood Legal, LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 26 2024
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion for partial remand (ECF No. 25) and remands this case in its entirety. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 1/26/2024. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )

Docket last updated: 04/02/2023 11:00 AM CDT
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from State of Illinois, Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2023CH00324) filed by Rozlin Financial Group, Inc Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20350355.(Strickler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Supplement
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rozlin Financial Group, Inc by Stephanie Anne Strickler (Strickler, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rozlin Financial Group, Inc by Nicole Marie Strickler (Strickler, Nicole)
Related: [-]