Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-51168

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tracey N Wise
Case #: 5:23-ap-05035
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chris Hughes
155 Twin Oaks Road
Kings Mountain, KY 40442
Represented By
Chris Hughes
contact info
Plaintiff
James D. Lyon, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee
James D. Lyon, Chapter 7 Trustee PO BOX 34188
Lexington, KY 40588
Represented By
Stephen Barnes
Walther, Gay & Mack, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
19 19 court BNC Notice Request - PDF Tue 05/09 10:23 AM
BNC Notice Request (Beverly Burden to be served) Related [+]. (tb)
Related: [-] 18 Order Remanding
18 18 order Remanding Tue 05/09 8:41 AM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (tb)
Related: [-] 12 Setting or Continuing Hearing
Monday, May 08, 2023
17 17 utility Certificate of Service Mon 05/08 12:56 PM
Certificate of Service of Agreed Order Authorizing Chapter 13 Trustee to Intervene and Holding Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance , filed by Stephen Barnes Related [+]. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-] 16 Agreed Order
16 16 order Agreed Order Mon 05/08 12:39 PM
Agreed Order Authorizing Chapter 13 Trustee to Intervene and Holding Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance (tb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
15 15 misc Proposed Order Submitted Fri 05/05 1:20 PM
Proposed Order submitted by Stephen Barnes on behalf of James D. Lyon Related [+]. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-] 12 Setting or Continuing Hearing,13 Status Report filed by Plaintiff James D. Lyon
14 14 utility Certificate of Service Fri 05/05 12:29 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference , filed by Stephen Barnes Related [+]. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-] 12 Setting or Continuing Hearing
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
13 13 utility Status Report Tue 05/02 3:59 PM
Status Report, filed by James D. Lyon. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Tue 05/02 11:12 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference on Order Granting Motion to Remand Trial, Continue Deadlines Generally and Hold Adversary in Abeyance [ECF No.10 ]. Status Conference to be held via teleconference on 5/16/2023 at 10:15 AM. Please refer to the Court website at www.kyeb.uscourts.gov for[LINK:KYEB Telephonic Hearings Call-In Instructions] . (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
11 11 utility Certificate of Service Tue 03/07 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Trial and Postpone Deadlines; and Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance , filed by Stephen Barnes Related [+]. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Continue Trial, Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance
10 10 order Continue Trial(O) Tue 03/07 2:20 PM
Order GRANTING Motion To Continue Trial Related [+], GRANTING Motion to Hold in Abeyance (tb)
Related: [-] 9 9
Monday, March 06, 2023
9 9 motion Continue Trial Tue 03/07 2:19 PM
Motion to Continue Trial and Other Deadlines and to Hold in Abeyance, filed by James D. Lyon (tb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/06 1:43 PM
Motion to Remand Trial, Continue Deadlines Generally, and Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance, filed by James D. Lyon (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 17, 2023
7 7 court Summons Service Executed Fri 02/17 8:47 AM
Summons Service Executed.. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
6 6 order Trial Thu 02/16 4:53 PM
Order for Trial. Trial set for 6/27/2023 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Certificate of Service Thu 02/16 8:23 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Application to Defer Filing Fee , filed by Stephen Barnes Related [+]. (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-] 2 Application to Defer Filing Fee
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
4 4 order Application to Defer Filing Fee(O) Thu 02/16 7:38 AM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee Related [+] (alf)
Related: [-] 2 in Adversary Proceeding 23-5035
3 3 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Wed 02/15 11:17 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
2 2 motion Defer Filing Fee Tue 02/14 1:42 PM
Application to Defer Filing Fee (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/14 1:35 PM
Adversary case 23-05035 Complaint, filed by James Lyon against Chris Hughes Fee Amount 350. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Barnes, Stephen)
Related: [-]