Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10484

Rhode Island Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Diane Finkle
Case #: 1:23-ap-01001
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 18, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
John M O'Hearne
PO Box 1201
Slatersville, RI 02896
Represented By
John M O'Hearne
contact info
Plaintiff
Coventry Lumber
Represented By
Robert D. Wieck
Wieck Deluca & Gemma Incorporated
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC
Represented By
Robert D. Wieck
Wieck Deluca & Gemma Incorporated
contact info
Plaintiff
William Finnegan
Represented By
Robert D. Wieck
Wieck Deluca & Gemma Incorporated
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/18 10:41 AM
Adversary Case Closed . (Ricciarelli, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
utility Terminate Document Mon 03/27 1:39 PM
Document terminated as moot as case has been dismissed- Related [+]. . (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne15 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne
Saturday, March 18, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/19 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)18 Judgment
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/19 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)17 Order
Thursday, March 16, 2023
18 18 order Judgment Thu 03/16 11:29 AM
Judgment Related [+] **See Judgment for details** (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
17 17 order Generic Order Thu 03/16 11:25 AM
Order Approving16 Stipulation filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne, Plaintiff William Finnegan, Plaintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, Plaintiff Coventry Lumber (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
court Notice of AP Closing (text only) Thu 03/16 11:30 AM
TEXT ONLY Notice of AP Closing. The within adversary proceeding has been resolved. If nothing further is filed in this case, the case will be closed thirty days from the date of this notice. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 03/15 12:59 PM
Stipulation Filed by Plaintiffs Coventry Lumber, William Finnegan, O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC. (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
15 15 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/07 11:22 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. Objections to Motion due: 03/21/2023, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Berman, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/07 10:16 AM
**WITHDRAWN** Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. Objections to Motion due: 03/21/2023, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Berman, Peter) Modified text on 3/7/2023 (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
misc Withdrawal of Document (option of text only) Tue 03/07 11:09 AM
TEXT ONLY Withdrawal of Document. Court will terminate WITHDRAWN document re:14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. (Berman, Peter)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Action Required Tue 03/07 9:15 AM
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A CORRECTIVE ACTION IS REQUIRED BY FILER - Related [+]. Rule 1005-1(d) language is non-existent on document. Solution: The filer is directed to refile the document in proper form. This document is terminated and no further action will be taken by the Court.. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne
utility Terminate Document Tue 03/07 11:35 AM
Document terminated - Document Withdrawn - see entry dated 3/7/2023. Related [+]. . (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne14 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/06 3:57 PM
**TERMINATED** Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. Objections to Motion due: 03/20/2023, plus an additional 3 days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Berman, Peter) Modified text on 3/7/2023 (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law
Sunday, March 05, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 03/06 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Order
Friday, March 03, 2023
11 11 order Generic Order Fri 03/03 1:00 PM
Order Granting9 Motion to File Out of Time filed by Plaintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, Plaintiff Coventry Lumber (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 03/02 4:23 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Filed by Plaintiffs Coventry Lumber, O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC. (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion File Out of Time Thu 03/02 4:23 PM
Motion to File Corporate Ownership Statement Out of Time Filed by Plaintiffs Coventry Lumber, O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC Related [+]. Status Check Due by:03/9/2023. (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-] 4 Order
Monday, February 27, 2023
8 8 answer Response Mon 02/27 11:38 AM
Response Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne re1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff William Finnegan, Plaintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, Plaintiff Coventry Lumber). (Berman, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/27 11:33 AM
**WITHDRAWN** Answer to Complaint Filed by John M O'Hearne Related [+]. (Berman, Peter) Modified text on 2/27/2023 (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff William Finnegan, Plaintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, Plaintiff Coventry Lumber
misc Withdrawal of Document (option of text only) Mon 02/27 11:34 AM
TEXT ONLY Withdrawal of Document. Court will terminate WITHDRAWN document re:7 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. Filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne. (Berman, Peter)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Document Mon 02/27 12:12 PM
Document terminated - Document Withdrawn - see entry dated 2/27/2023. Related [+]. . (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne7 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant John M O'Hearne
Friday, February 24, 2023
utility Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY) Fri 02/24 8:49 AM
(TEXT ONLY) CORRECTIVE ACTION TAKEN- Related [+]. Deficiency: **Incorrect deadline was set within event. Deadline has been corrected by Clerks Office.** (Ricciarelli, Pamela)
Related: [-] Set Discovery Plan and Sched Order
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/22 11:22 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on John M O'Hearne Court will set Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Deadlines if applicable.. Status Check Due by:02/24/2023. (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Set Discovery Plan and Sched Order Thu 02/23 1:50 PM
**PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY**. Discovery Plan and Sched Order Deadlines set Related [+]. Discovery Plan Due by: 5/15/2023. Issue Scheduling Order on: 5/22/2023. (Ricciarelli, Pamela) Modified on 2/24/2023 (Ricciarelli, Pamela)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Service Executed
Friday, February 17, 2023
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 02/18 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)4 Order
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
4 4 order Generic Order Wed 02/15 9:49 AM
Order Requiring Filing of Corporate Ownership Statement in Accordance with Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7007.1 for Paintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen LLC ONLY Related [+]. Compliance Due by: 3/1/2023. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-] ument1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff William Finnegan, Plaintiff O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, Plaintiff Coventry Lumber
3 3 court Alias Summons Issued Wed 02/15 9:36 AM
Alias Summons Issued on John M O'Hearne Date Issued 2/15/2023, Answer Due 3/17/2023. (Sweeney, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
utility Set Discovery Plan and Sched Order Fri 02/24 8:48 AM
Discovery Plan and Sched Order Deadlines set Related [+]. Discovery Plan Due by: 5/9/2023. Issue Scheduling Order on: 5/16/2023. (Ricciarelli, Pamela)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Service Executed
utility Set Discovery Plan and Sched Order Fri 02/24 8:51 AM
**Duplicate Entry**. Discovery Plan and Sched Order Deadlines set Related [+]. Discovery Plan Due by: 5/9/2023. Issue Scheduling Order on: 5/16/2023. (Ricciarelli, Pamela) Modified on 2/24/2023 (Ricciarelli, Pamela)
Related: [-] 6 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 02/14 2:59 PM
Summons Issued on John M O'Hearne[LINK:Summons Issued] (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 02/14 2:59 PM
Adversary case 1:23-ap-01001. (65 (Dischargeability - other),02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))): Complaint by Coventry Lumber, O'Hearne Forest Glen, LLC, William Finnegan against John M O'Hearne Fee Amount $350 Answer Due by: 03/16/2023. U.S. Governmental Agency Answer due by 03/21/2023. (Wieck, Robert)
Related: [-]