Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:23-cv-00205
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 23-00002-00578-3-SEA
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 3:56 AM PDT
Defendant
Mary M Knight School District
Represented By
Sarah C Johnson
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Charles A Chavez
Pacifica Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Moreland Family
on behalf of and by 2713 S. ANDOVER STREET
SEATTLE, WA 98108


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, August 16, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/16 4:10 PM
REPLY in Further Support of Request for Reconsideration, filed by Plaintiff Moreland Family, re26 MOTION for Reconsideration re24 Order. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 08/06 12:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No.26 ). Plaintiffs seek reconsideration of this Court's previous order but fail to show specific manifest error or new facts or legal authority. Accordingly, they provide the Court with no basis to reconsider its prior determination. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
26 26 motion Reconsideration Fri 08/02 3:54 PM
MOTION Request for Reconsideration to Summary Judgment re24 Order, filed by Plaintiff Moreland Family. Noted by Clerk for 8/2/2024. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
25 25 order Judgment by Court Wed 07/24 4:28 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Summary judgment is GRANTED to Defendant. The ALJ's order is AFFIRMED. Plaintiffs' complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
Related: [-]
24 24 order 1 - Order Wed 07/24 4:24 PM
ORDER. The Court GRANTS summary judgment to Defendants and AFFIRMS the ALJ's order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) Modified on 7/24/2024 re mail out (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/05 10:49 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Mary M Knight School District, TO RESPONSE to14 Stipulated MOTION For Relief From Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines and to Set a Briefing Schedule (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
22 22 misc Reply (non motion) Tue 08/15 9:09 AM
REPLY BRIEF to20 Brief - Opening, by Plaintiff Moreland Family. (SS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
21 21 misc Brief - Responsive Fri 07/21 10:33 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re20 Brief - Opening by Defendant Mary M Knight School District. (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
20 20 misc Brief - Opening Fri 06/23 9:15 AM
OPENING BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Moreland Family. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
misc Receipt Fri 05/26 2:28 PM
RECEIPT of USB Drive with Audio of Exhibit Vol 8 Administrative Record re19 Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials (Placed in Clerk's Office Documents Room in expando file). (SS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Paper or Physical Materials with the Clerk Wed 05/24 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Filing Vol. 8 Audio File to Sealed Administrative Record in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Mary M Knight School District in re18 Sealed Administrative Record- Non Social Security,. (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
18 18 sealdoc Sealed Administrative Record - Non Social Security Wed 05/24 10:41 AM
SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Mary M Knight School District.(Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Vol. 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Vol. 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Vol. 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Vol. 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Vol. 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Vol. 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Vol. 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Vol. 8
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion to Seal Tue 05/23 4:11 PM
ORDER granting Parties'16 Stipulated MOTION to Seal Unredacted Administrative Record. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to maintain the administrative record under seal once it is filed. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
16 16 motion Stipulated Motion to Seal Mon 05/22 1:26 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Seal Unredacted Administrative Record , filed by Defendant Mary M Knight School District. Noting Date 5/22/2023, (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/02 8:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Parties'14 Stipulated MOTION For Relief From Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines. The current case scheduling deadlines, at Docket Number 13 , are VACATED. The Court SETS the following briefing deadlines: Plaintiff's Opening Brief is due 45 days after receipt of the administrative record from the Office of the Superintendent of Public Instruction. Defendant's Opposition and Opposing Brief is due 30 days following Plaintiff's brief. Plaintiff's Opposition and Reply are due 20 days following Defendant's brief. Defendant's Reply is due 20 days following Plaintiff's reply. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 05/01 2:02 PM
Stipulated MOTION For Relief From Initial Case Scheduling Deadlines and to Set a Briefing Schedule , filed by Defendant Mary M Knight School District. Noting Date 5/1/2023, (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 20, 2023
13 13 order JCC-Interim JSR Minute Order Mon 03/20 11:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation. The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/1/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/8/2023, Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2023. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Mon 03/20 11:14 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (KMP) Modified on 3/20/2023 to add cc. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 02/23 1:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings. Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. (GMR- cc: pltf via USPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
10 10 misc Consent Letter & Form Wed 02/22 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/22/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR- cc: pltf via USPS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/21 12:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by Mary M Knight School District.(Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
8 8 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 02/17 12:15 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Mary M Knight School District (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
6 6 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 02/16 10:08 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. cc: Plaintiff via USPS. (CR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/16 10:05 AM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Association Wed 02/15 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Charles A Chavez on behalf of Defendant Mary M. Knight School District. (Chavez, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 11:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Mary M. Knight School District (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice-Other Wed 02/15 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Mary M. Knight School District. (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/15 11:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Defendant Mary M. Knight School District. (Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/15 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 23 2-00578 3-SEA; Related [+] Attorney Sarah C Johnson added to party Mary M. Knight School District(pty:dft), filed by Mary M. Knight School District.(Johnson, Sarah)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-7890690
Att: 1 Complaint