North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 5:23-cv-00070
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2023 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin A. Bennett
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Colonel Robert J. Clark
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Daniel H. Hibner
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
John Hill
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Scott A. Spellmon
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Christine Wormuth
Represented By
Benjamin J Higgins
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Plaintiff
Leebcor Services, LLC
430 McLaws Circle
Williamsburg, VA 23185
Represented By
Patrick Kevin Burns
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Suzanne R. Walker
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
36 36 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 11/29 3:59 PM
MANDATE of US Court of Appeals as to29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
35 35 appeal USCA Order Wed 11/29 3:47 PM
ORDER of US Court of Appeals granting motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal as to29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
34 34 misc Transcript Tue 09/05 11:58 AM
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/28/2023, Motion Hearing, before Judge Terrence W. Boyle. Court Reporter/ Carolyn High, Telephone number 919-630-2987, cissyhigh@nc.rr.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's[LINK:website] Redaction Request due 9/29/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2023. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
33 33 appeal USCA Order Mon 08/14 4:18 PM
ORDER of US Court of Appeals as to29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. Upon review of submissions relative to appellant's motion for injunction pending appeal and request for expedited briefing schedule, the court denies the motion. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
32 32 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 08/07 11:51 AM
US Court of Appeals Case Number 23-1814 (Emily Borneisen, Case Manager) as to29 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
30 30 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 08/02 12:32 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding29 Notice of Appeal,. (Foell, S.)
Related: [-]
29 29 appeal Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment Wed 08/02 12:03 PM
Notice of Appeal filed by Leebcor Services, LLC as to28 Judgment,27 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Filing fee, receipt number 500005277. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 08/03 12:17 PM
Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 500005277. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
28 28 order Judgment Tue 08/01 12:50 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendants motion to dismiss [DE 18] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs complaint is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction [DE 3] is therefore DENIED AS MOOT. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/1/2023. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
27 27 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/01 12:30 PM
ORDER - granting18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/31/2023. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 07/28 1:17 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held in Raleigh, NC before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2023. All parties present and ready to proceed. Oral argument held. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Cissy High, High Reporting) (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings Fri 07/07 3:59 PM
Set Hearing: Motions Hearing set for 7/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 06/15 5:01 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/15/2023. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 06/15 11:22 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding24 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
24 24 motion Continue Wed 06/14 2:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings Tue 06/13 2:35 PM
Set Hearing: Motions Hearing set for 6/20/2023 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Mon 06/12 11:59 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM,3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/05 8:24 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/22 4:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
21 21 10 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 05/15 3:16 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding4 Memorandum in Support,20 Response in Opposition to Motion,3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/01 10:10 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
19 19 14 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 05/01 10:08 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Declaration J HIll,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: FAR disputes,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Leebcor Claim
18 18 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/01 10:01 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 05/01 9:58 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Benjamin J Higgins on behalf of Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth substituting for Chelsea W Draper. (Higgins, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/14 11:45 AM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on USA c/o Attorney General of United States on March 7, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/10 5:21 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Lt. General Scott A. Spellman on March 6, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Fri 03/10 10:04 AM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Brigadier General Daniel H. Hibner on March 2, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 3:18 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Christine Wormuth on March 1, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 12:03 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Colonel Benjamin A. Bennett on March 1, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 12:01 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Office of US Attorney c/o Civil Process Clerk on March 1, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 11:58 AM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Colonel Robert J. Clark on March 1, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 11:56 AM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice of Appearance of Suzanne R. Walker, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Disclosure of Corporae Affiliations and Other Entities with a Direct Financial Interest filed by Leebcor Services, LLC served on Johnn T.C. Hill on March 1, 2023. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 03/07 10:43 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Patrick Kevin Burns on behalf of Leebcor Services, LLC. (Burns, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
utility Motion Submitted Wed 03/01 11:23 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/23 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Benjamin A. Bennett, Robert J. Clark, Daniel H. Hibner, John Hill, Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Christine Wormuth, Attorney General, US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 02/23 2:11 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:1 Complaint. Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
6 6 cmp Complaint Thu 02/16 9:46 AM
COMPLAINT Corrected against Brigadier General Daniel H. Hibner, Commander, South Atlantic Division, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, in His Official Capacity, Honorable Christine Wormuth, Secretary of the Army, in Her Official Capacity, John Hill, Chief, Military Branch, Wilmington District, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, in His Official Capacity, Lieutenant General Scott A. Spellmon, U.S. Army Chief of Engineers, in His Official Capacity, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, USA, Colonel Benjamin A. Bennett, Commander, Wilmington District, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, in His Official Capacity ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6947803.), filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 02/15 3:22 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Leebcor Services, LLC (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 02/15 3:20 PM
Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 02/15 3:17 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/15 3:15 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Suzanne R. Walker on behalf of Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/15 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6947803.), filed by Leebcor Services, LLC. (Walker, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons