South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 8:23-cv-00625
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
GoFit LLC
Represented By
Christopher Ronald Wray
Mcangus Goudelock And Courie (gre)
contact info
Amanda Bradley
Mcangus Goudelock And Courie (gre)
contact info
Charles O Williams, III
Gallivan White Boyd (gre)
contact info
Plaintiff
Gretchen K Fant
Represented By
Daniel Draisen
The Injury Law Firm PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Marshall A Fant, III
Represented By
Daniel Draisen
The Injury Law Firm PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/03 4:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GoFit LLC. (Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Fri 06/14 3:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/14/24. (alew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/29 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for mediation is extended until June 4, 2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/29/24.(alew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/26 5:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Mediate by GoFit LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 4:10 PM
CONSENT SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/30/2024, Mediation Due by 4/15/2024, Discovery due by 6/1/2024, Motion in Limine due by 8/1/2024, Motions due by 7/15/2024, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/15/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 10/1/2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/16/24. (alew)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 01/16 4:07 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend/Correct 19 Amended Conference and Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/16/24.(alew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Thu 01/04 4:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Scheduling Order,, by GoFit LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Consent Scheduling Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
21 21 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Mon 11/13 4:19 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by GoFit LLC.(Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Expert Report
Monday, June 19, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Mon 06/19 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Amanda Bradley for August 16-August 25, 2023 (Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/14 2:45 PM
AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/20/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/12/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/12/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/30/2023, Discovery due by 1/2/2024, Motions due by 1/16/2024, Mediation Due by 1/30/2024, Motion in Limine due by 2/28/2024, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/8/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 3/29/2024. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/14/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 06/09 11:34 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/9/23.(alew, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
16 16 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 06/08 5:33 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by GoFit LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/22/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bradley, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
13 13 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 05/24 6:10 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by GoFit LLC.(Wray, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference Wed 05/10 2:22 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: Phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit a joint proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days. The parties are further directed to submit joint responses to Local Civil Rule 26.03(A)(1-4) (D.S.C.) interrogatories within 14 days. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
notice Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Mon 04/10 10:56 AM
**TIME CHANGE ONLY** NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Telephone Conference, Tuesday 5/9/2023 @ 2:00pm cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Telephone Conference set for Tuesday 5/9/2023 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. (alew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
9 9 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/03 11:31 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, May 9, 2023 2:00 PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/3/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/03 11:24 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/24/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/20/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/12/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/11/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/31/2023, Discovery due by 10/2/2023, Motions due by 10/16/2023, Mediation Due by 10/30/2023, Motion in Limine due by 11/29/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/8/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 12/29/2023. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/3/23. (alew, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/28 2:02 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by GoFit LLC.(Williams, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/15 2:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marshall A Fant, III, Gretchen K Fant. Service due by 5/16/2023 (Draisen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 02/15 12:18 PM
Summons Issued as to GoFit LLC. (alew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 02/15 12:17 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gretchen K Fant, Marshall A Fant, III.(alew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/15 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against GoFit LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10943505.), filed by Marshall A Fant, III, Gretchen K Fant. Service due by 5/15/2023(alew)
Related: [-]