Connecticut District Court
Judge:Jeffrey A Meyer
Referred: Robert A Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00201
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Feb 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2023 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Aetna Global Benefits Limited
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Meritain Health, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Meritain Health National General
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
First Health Network
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
First Health Group Corp.
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Student Health Agency, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Signature Administrators
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Medicare
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Health Inc
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Defendant
Aetna Better Health, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Walter Begos
Robinson & Cole Llp, Stamford
contact info
Theodore J. Tucci
Robinson & Cole, Llp-Htfd
contact info
Plaintiff
Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC
Represented By
Patrick J. Monahan, II
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info
Jennifer Rignoli
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven A.R. Murphy
Represented By
Patrick J. Monahan, II
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info
Jennifer Rignoli
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info
Plaintiff
Murphy Medical Associates, LLC
Represented By
Patrick J. Monahan, II
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info
Jennifer Rignoli
Parrett, Porto, Parese & Colwell - Hamden
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
71 71 service Certificate of Service Tue 02/06 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Better Health, Inc., Aetna Global Benefits Limited, Aetna Health Inc, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Medicare, Aetna Signature Administrators, Aetna Student Health Agency, Inc., Aetna, Inc., First Health Group Corp., First Health Network, Meritain Health National General, Meritain Health, Inc. re70 Judgment,,(Datlow, Milanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Court's Judgment Order
Monday, February 05, 2024
70 70 order Judgment Mon 02/05 1:50 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Aetna Better Health, Inc., Aetna Global Benefits Limited, Aetna Health Inc, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Medicare, Aetna Signature Administrators, Aetna Student Health Agency, Inc., Aetna, Inc., First Health Group Corp., First Health Network, Meritain Health National General, Meritain Health, Inc. against Steven A.R. Murphy in accordance with the court's order and the case is closed. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/5/2024.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
69 69 service Certificate of Service Mon 02/05 10:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aetna Health Inc re 68 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, (Datlow, Milanna)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Mon 02/05 2:06 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/02 6:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. #66 ). Defendants have filed an unopposed motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has not filed any objection or response. "Failure to submit a memorandum in opposition to a motion may be deemed sufficient cause to grant the motion, except where the pleadings provide sufficient grounds to deny the motion." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(a)(2). Because it appears that defendants' arguments for dismissal have merit, the Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/2/2024. (Pincus, K.)
Related: [-]