California Southern District Court
Judge:Cynthia Bashant
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:23-cv-00313
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0252 Telecommunications Act
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2023 3:47 AM PDT
Defendant
ACE Business Solutions LLC
Represented By
Destine Demery
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Michael L. Branch
Law Office Of Michael L. Branch
contact info
Andrew Kenneth Magloughlin
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Damon Kalt
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Atlas Investment Ventures LLC
Represented By
Cody Austin DeCamp
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Benton Julian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Atlas Marketing Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Cody Austin DeCamp
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Benton Julian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sandra Barnes
Represented By
Destine Demery
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Michael L. Branch
Law Office Of Michael L. Branch
contact info
Andrew Kenneth Magloughlin
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Damon Kalt
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Todd DiRoberto
Represented By
Cody Austin DeCamp
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Benton Julian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kurt Hannigan
Defendant
Netlatitude, Inc.
Defendant
Eric Petersen
Represented By
Cody Austin DeCamp
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Bezalel Stern
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Benton Julian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stratics Networks Inc.
Represented By
Meagan S Tom
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Cunningham
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tek Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Cody Austin DeCamp
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Christine M Reilly
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Benton Julian
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Zachary Alan Dietert
Doj
contact info
Matthew Acton Robinson
Doj-Civ
contact info
Daniel Kadane Crane-Hirsch
U. S. Department Of Justice
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kenan Azzeh
Terminated: 02/23/2023
Defendant
Kasm
Terminated: 02/23/2023

GPO Mar 06 2024
Tentative Order: (1) Granting Defendant Stratics Networks Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [50-1]); (2) Denying Defendant Atlas Marketing Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike (ECF No.[45-1]); and (3) Denying Defendant Ace Business Solutions LLC's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [42-1]) Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 03/06/2024. (mjw)
GPO May 29 2024
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order [Doc. No. 94]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 05/29/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
GPO Apr 04 2025
ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Motions to Compel Deposition due by 4/11/2025. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 4/18/2025. Defendants Amended Responses due by 04/18/2025.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 04/04/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER Following Joint Discovery Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/24/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc)

Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
165 165 motion Discovery Fri 05/09 2:55 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery to Permit Discovery After Close of Discovery of Consumers Identified in Plaintiff's Amended Initial Disclosures by ACE Business Solutions LLC, Sandra Barnes. (Blynn, Daniel) (mjw).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
164 164 misc Mail Returned Thu 05/08 10:27 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re158 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Damon Kalt. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
163 163 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/06 9:58 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re158 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Destine Demery. (mjw)
Related: [-]
162 162 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 05/05 2:42 PM
ORDER Denying Motion to Compel Ms. Sharon Davenports Deposition [Doc. No.155 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 05/05/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]