New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-01296
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Granicus, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Paul Kaye
Phillips Nizer LLP
contact info
Defendant
T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By
Caroline Ann Morgan
Culhane Meadows PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ari Teman
1521 Alton Road #888
Miami Beach, FL 33139


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Tue 01/09 4:25 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See LeSane v. Hall's Sec. Analyst, Inc., 239 F.3d 206, 209 (2d Cir. 2001) ("[I]t is unquestioned that Rule 41(b) also gives the district court authority to dismiss a plaintiff's case sua sponte for failure to prosecute..."). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/9/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/13 3:42 PM
ORDER: If Mr. Teman intends to file an amended complaint, it should be filed by November 30, 2023. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to serve targeted limited subpoenas at ECF No. 29 is DENIED without prejudice. Because Mr. Teman did not appear at the scheduled conference on October 12, the Court adjourned the conference to October 27, 2023; however, the October 27 conference is adjourned sine dine in light of the Courts further orders to Mr. Teman as outlined above. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff at the address of record AND to: Ari Teman No. 18244-104; FCI Miami; FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION; P.O. BOX 779800; MIAMI, FL 33177. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2023.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/13/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 10/13 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2023. Ari Teman, Pro Se Plaintiff does not appear. Richard Kaye for Defendant Granicus. Caroline Morgan for Defendant T-Mobile. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/27/2023 at 3:00 p.m. (tdh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/02 12:21 PM
ORDER The Court shall hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on October 12 at 3:00 P.M. The parties shall contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (Access Code: 3768660). The parties are asked to dial in at least ten minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr..) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/2/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
30 30 misc Status Report Fri 09/29 1:05 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
29 29 misc Letter Thu 08/17 9:29 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Ari Teman, dated 8/16/23 re: "UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SERVE TARGETED, LIMITED SUBPOENAS"- The subpoenas will be limited to IP addresses at or around the time of the alleged incidents, GPS coordinates at those times, both of which will match the individuals to the impersonating accounts and IP addresses provided by Granicus etc. The plaintiff will agree in advance to keep any confidential information confidential, and to file any requests to unseal such information with the Court. Document filed by Ari Teman.(sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Application for the Court to Request Counsel Wed 08/09 4:56 PM
ORDER: denying without prejudice to renewal26 Application for the Court to Request Counsel; denying without prejudice to renewal27 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. As stated at the August 8, 2023 conference, Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint by September 15, 2023. Defendants shall file a letter by September 29, 2023 indicating whether they still intend to move to dismiss. If Defendants intend to move to dismiss the amended complaint, the letter should include a joint (with Plaintiff) proposed briefing schedule for the motion(s). Additionally, for the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs application for appointment of pro bono counsel (ECF Nos. 26, 27) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/09/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/09 4:57 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2023. (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
27 27 motion Court to Request Counsel Tue 08/08 4:38 PM
APPLICATION, Re: for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Ari Teman.(sc)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs motion Court to Request Counsel Tue 08/08 2:34 PM
APPLICATION, Re: for the Court to Request Pro Bono Counsel. Document filed by Ari Teman.(sc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 08/31 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr: Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/8/2023. Ari Teman, Pro Se Plaintiff. Richard Kaye for Defendant Granicus. Caroline Morgan for Defendant T-Mobile. See Docket No. 28 for complete details. (tdh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 07/18 3:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER granting24 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendants' requests for a pre-motion conference are GRANTED. The Court shall hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on August 8, 2023 at 12:00 P.M. The parties shall contact the Court at 1-888-363-4749 (Access Code: 3768660). Plaintiff may, if he so chooses, file a written response to Defendants' submissions by August 4, 2023. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/18/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/18 3:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/4/2023 (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 07/27 6:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/8/2023 at 12:00 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
24 24 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Tue 06/20 10:51 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated June 20, 2023. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Tue 06/20 10:17 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Richard P. Kaye dated 6/20/2023 Document filed by Granicus, Inc...(Kaye, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
22 22 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/02 11:37 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
21 21 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/23 11:45 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Wildebeest Topco, LLC, Other Affiliate Wildebeest Midco, Inc., Other Affiliate Granicus Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Granicus Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Granicus, Inc.. Document filed by Granicus, Inc...(Kaye, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Conference Wed 05/17 11:58 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; denying19 Letter Motion for Conference re:19 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 5/12/2023.FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 5/12/2023. The Court has reviewed the parties' letter and determined that a stay is not warranted at this time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to July 18, 2023. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/17/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/17 11:59 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Granicus, Inc. answer due 7/18/2023; T-Mobile USA, Inc. answer due 7/18/2023. (ate)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time Conference Fri 05/12 4:56 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 5/12/2023., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 5/12/2023. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/05 11:54 AM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/5/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/05 11:56 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Granicus, Inc. answer due 5/18/2023. (ate)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
17 17 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 05/04 11:45 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Richard P. Kaye dated 05/04/2023. Document filed by Granicus, Inc...(Kaye, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/03 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Paul Kaye on behalf of Granicus, Inc...(Kaye, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/25 12:48 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/25/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/25 12:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: T-Mobile USA, Inc. answer due 5/18/2023. (ate)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/24 10:14 AM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 4/24/23. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/04 2:27 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/4/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/04 2:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: T-Mobile USA, Inc. answer due 4/27/2023. (ate)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/03 3:21 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Caroline A. Morgan, Esq. dated 4/3/23. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/03 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Ann Morgan on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc...(Morgan, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 03/28 10:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Granicus, Inc., served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, NY Secretary of State Office. Document filed by Ari Teman. (sc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 03/28 10:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, NY Secretary of State Office on 3/16/23. Document filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. (sc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 03/28 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. T-Mobile USA, Inc., served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service was accepted by Ellen Jones, Rep. of Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Ari Teman. (sc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 03/02 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 03/02 1:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/28 2:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T-Mobile USA, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ari Teman. (sc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/28 2:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Granicus, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ari Teman. (sc)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Pro Se Assistants Tue 02/28 2:37 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:5 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Pro Se Assistants Tue 02/28 2:40 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:6 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 02/28 4:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Granicus, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (sha)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Order by USPS Tue 02/28 4:10 PM
Mailed a copy of Summons Issued, Information Packet to Ari Teman at 1521 Alton Road #888, Miami Beach, FL 33139. (sha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
misc Pro Se Payment of Fee - Processed Wed 02/22 11:30 AM
Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 02/22/2023, Receipt Number 12856. (stt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
4 4 misc Letter Tue 02/21 10:13 AM
LETTER from A. Teman, dated 2/13/23 re: FEE PAID IN CIVIL ACTION #23-CV-1296(LTS) AS DIRECTED BY PRO SE OFFICE & REQUEST FOR ECF PERMISSION & EMERGENCY ORDER DIRECTING T-MOBILE TO IDENTIFY USERS OF THE IP ADDRESS. Document filed by Ari Teman.(sc)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Tue 02/21 10:07 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Ari Teman consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Ari Teman.(sc)
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 02/17 9:48 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 2. Mailed to: Ari Teman 1521 Alton Road #888 Miami Beach, FL 33139. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
2 2 4 pgs order Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application Thu 02/16 4:09 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 3/20/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 3/20/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/16/2023) (sha)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Thu 02/16 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/16 8:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Granicus, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Document filed by Teman Ari..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/16 8:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]