Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:23-cv-00059
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:USCA - Federal, 24-00136
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 15, 2023 5:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Charter Communications Operating, LLC
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Spectrum Gulf Coast, LLC
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Time Warner Cable Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Charter Communications LLC
Plaintiff
Touchstream Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael William Gray
Shook Hardy & Bacon Llp - Houston
contact info
Anita Liu, I
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
404 404 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/09 2:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re402 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Touchstream Technologies, Inc. .(Dykal, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order