California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:22-cv-07836
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2022
Terminated:Oct 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 07, 2023 1:42 AM PDT
Defendant
Danita R. Carrillo-Zolck
Defendant
County of Santa Cruz
Represented By
Negine Marie Mansour Sewitsky
Office Of The County Counsel, Santa Cruz County
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Mendoza
Represented By
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aron Quolas
Represented By
Gregory B. Thomas
Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David James Rodriguez
3335 Placer Street Unit 145
Redding, CA 96001

GPO Apr 13 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2023. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jul 20 2023
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Oct 16 2023
ce of Electronic Filing (NEF)ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Noti

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 16, 2023
45 45 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Mon 10/16 10:02 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
44 44 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/16 10:02 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
43 43 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 07/20 12:28 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Amended Pleadings due by 8/17/2023. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A combined list of names of counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 30, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Amended Pleadings due by 8/17/2023. Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
42 42 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 07/20 12:26 PM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
41 41 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 07/18 12:24 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Danita R. Carrillo-Zolck, County of Santa Cruz, Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. (Hall, Jasper)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 07/17 11:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. ECF No.20 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, July 27, 2023 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
39 39 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 07/14 3:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas.. (Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/14 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jasper Hall (Hall, Jasper)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
37 37 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 07/12 4:08 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byDanita R. Carrillo-Zolck. (Keough, Michael)
Related: [-] 36 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
36 36 motion Dismiss Wed 06/21 3:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Danita R. Carrillo-Zolck. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/5/2023. Replies due by 7/12/2023.(Keough, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/21 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Keough (Keough, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
34 34 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 05/22 9:53 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byJesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. (Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Monday, May 15, 2023
33 33 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 05/15 11:58 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDavid James Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Friday, May 12, 2023
32 32 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 05/12 9:35 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCounty of Santa Cruz. (Mansour Sewitsky, Negine)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Dismiss County of Santa Cruz's Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, May 11, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/11 4:46 PM
ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Aron Quolas, Jesus Mendoza, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Responses due by 5/22/2023. Replies due by 5/15/2023. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 11, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
30 30 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Tue 05/09 2:44 PM
RESPONSE re29 Opposition/Response to Motion of Plaintiff for Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. (Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 05/08 10:24 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDavid James Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/02 9:29 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 5/12/2023. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 05/02 8:59 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 24, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
26 26 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 04/27 12:57 AM
Response to Order to Show Cause19 Order to Show Cause, byDavid James Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 04/27 12:50 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDavid James Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-] 6 MOTION to Dismiss County of Santa Cruz's Motion to Dismiss
Monday, April 24, 2023
24 24 oth_sup Exhibits Mon 04/24 11:26 AM
EXHIBIT - one CD Received Exhibit A to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byJesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. Related [+] (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 20
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/24 9:46 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 26, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_sup Re-notice motion Mon 04/24 9:41 AM
Renotice motion hearing re20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byJesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. Related [+] (Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-] 20
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/24 9:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file20 Motion to Dismiss. Hearing date of June 8, 2023, is vacated due to the date being listed as unavailable to further settings on Judge Tigar's calendar. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Judge's webpage on the Court's website regarding scheduling before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 04/24 9:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/8/2023. Replies due by 5/15/2023.(Thomas, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 13, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 04/13 9:51 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2023. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 13, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 04/05 11:03 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Before the Court is Motion to Dismiss. ECF No.6 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 78(b) and Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. The hearing on this matter, currently scheduled for, April 13, 2023 is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eac, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 03/07 5:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mansour Sewitsky, Negine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/28 1:21 PM
NOTICE by County of Santa Cruz NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SANTA CRUZS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED CIVIL RIGHTS LAWSUIT COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES TITLE 42 SECTION 1983, 1985 COMPENSATORY DAMAGES (Mansour Sewitsky, Negine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
15 15 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 02/21 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David James Rodriguez (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/16 10:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 12, 2022 by 2:00 p.m. for the motion hearing and May 15, 2023 by 2:00 p.m. for the CMC. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . , Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss County of Santa Cruz's Motion to Dismiss . Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mll, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
13 13 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/16 7:27 AM
Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 2/16/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
12 12 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Thu 02/16 7:18 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
11 11 ORDER For Reassignment to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/15/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
10 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Report re Service of Process. Plaintiff to file proof of service or status report re service by 2/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/9/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
9 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Cruz.. (Mansour Sewitsky, Negine)
Related: [-]
8 8 CORRECTED CLERK'S NOTICE RE DEADLINE FOR CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by February 14, 2023 . Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DEADLINE FOR CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by February 9, 2023 . Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
6 6 MOTION to Dismiss County of Santa Cruz's Motion to Dismiss filed by County of Santa Cruz. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 2/21/2023. Replies due by 2/28/2023.(Mansour Sewitsky, Negine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 19, 2023
5 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. T here is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
4 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT includes Exhibits against All Defendants. Filed byDavid James Rodriguez. (Rodriguez, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
3 3 Summons Issued as to Danita R. Carrillo-Zolck, County of Santa Cruz, Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Danita R. Carrillo-Zolck, County of Santa Cruz, Jesus Mendoza, Aron Quolas (Filing fee $ 402.). Filed byDavid James Rodriguez. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2022.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt