California Central District Court
Judge:S James Otero
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:14-cv-07645
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0009 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2014
Terminated:Apr 21, 2015
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2015 12:01 AM PDT
Petitioner
Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited
Represented By
William A Wilson, III
Wilson International Law LLC
contact info
Robert Ira Petrokofsky
Robert Petrokofsky Law Offices
contact info
Respondent
Madison One Acme Inc
Represented By
David Shentai Sun
John L Sun Law Offices
contact info
Respondent
So's (USA) Co. Inc


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 17, 2015
37 37 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 09/17 8:13 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited Against Madison One Acme Inc ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION IN FULL OF MONETARY PORTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO MADISON ONE ACME, INC. DBA SOLSTICE MEDICINE COMPANY filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
36 36 1 pgs judgmentCV Judgment - Default by Judge Tue 04/21 12:27 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: JUDGMENT ON PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT31 AND ON PETITIONER'S MOTION ON PETITION TOCONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD12 . 1. The Final Award, the Interim Costs Award, and the Final Costs Award, are hereby confirmed as to both Madison and So's. 2. Petitioner is awarded the principal sum of $2,082,278.64, plus the additional sum of $129,614.76, for accrued interest through October 2, 2014, the date of filing of the Petition, plus additional accrued interest from October 2, 2014, through the date of entry of the Judgment, at the rate of $456.39 per day, in a total amount to be determined, all as against Madison and Sos, and each of them, jointly and severally. 3. The total award shall bear post-Judgment interest at the rate prescribed by law. 4. Madison and Sos, and each of them, are ordered to, and shall, immediately deliver to Petitioner, the Original Registration Certificate No. ZC201000001, issued by the Peoples Republic of China as to the Balm described in the Final Award. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Default Judgment Tue 04/21 12:19 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT31 .The Courtshall issue a judgment order separately. (lc)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Hearing Tue 04/21 12:17 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITIONER'S MOTION ON PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD12 .The Court DENIES Petitioner's motion with respect to costs and attorney's fees accrued in pursuing this Petition. The Court GRANTS Petitioner's Motion in all other respects. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
33 33 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/15 3:38 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on 4/20/15 is continued to Tuesday, 5/26/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
32 32 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/14 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION: The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re MOTION for Default Judgment against Respondent Sos (U.S.A.) Co.31 , set for hearing on May 4, 2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
31 31 motion Default Judgment Fri 03/27 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Respondent Sos (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. which was erroneously named in the arbitration as Sos (USA) Company, Inc. and as Sos (U.S.A.) Company, Inc. filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petitioner Application for Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.),
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Cathy Wei Kin Wong in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.),
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of William Wai Lim Fan in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.),
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.),
Att: 5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.),
Att: 6 [Proposed] Default Judgment by Court as to So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.)
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
30 30 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Wed 03/25 1:16 PM
ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Respondent SO'S (U.S.A.) CO., INC. which was erroneously named in the Arbitration as SO'S (USA) COMPANY, INC. and as So's (U.S.A.) COMPANY, INC. 28 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; Non compliance with Local Rule 6-1 Notice and Service of Motion. (lc)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Wed 03/25 12:17 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Respondent SO'S (U.S.A.) CO., INC. which was erroneously named in the Arbitration as SO'S (USA) COMPANY, INC. and as So's (U.S.A.) COMPANY, INC. 28 . The following error(s) was found: Missing formal Local Rule Notice of Motion. No Hearing was scheduled on Judges motion calendar.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below; Memorandum in support of the "Motion" is not identified in the text. The correct event is: MOTION: DEFAULT JUDGMENT, follow prompts to select date, time and Judge. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
28 28 motion Default Judgment Tue 03/24 12:04 PM
APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Respondent SO'S (U.S.A.) CO., INC. which was erroneously named in the Arbitration as SO'S (USA) COMPANY, INC. and as So's (U.S.A.) COMPANY, INC. filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Cathy Wei Kin Wong in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of William Wai Lim Fan in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky in Support of Petitioner's Application for Default Judgment by Court,
Att: 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Default Judgment by Court as to So's
Monday, March 23, 2015
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 03/23 9:27 AM
REPLY Reply to Opposition to Motion MOTION for Hearing Hearing on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award 12 filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Mengyi Chen in Support of Petitioner's Reply to Opposition to Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky in Support of Petitioner's Reply to Opposition to Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
26 26 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/17 10:56 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearin gon 3/23/2015 is hereby continued to Monday,4/20/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 03/16 12:24 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION for Hearing Hearing on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award 12 filed by Respondent Madison One Acme Inc. (Sun, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2015
24 24 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 03/02 9:14 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 0, filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.. (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 27, 2015
23 23 order Hearing Fri 02/27 4:52 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER OVERRULING RESPONDENT'S OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD. The Objection is not a substantive opposition to the Motion and the Court will not construe it as such. In the interest of adjudicating the Motion on the merits, the Court orders as follows: 1. Respondent MUST FILE an opposition or notice of non-opposition to the Motion no later than March 16, 2015. 2. Petitioner MAY FILE a reply to the opposition no later than March 23, 2015. The Court shall adjudicate the Motion without oral argument. (See ECF No. 18.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 02/12 12:57 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to So's (USA) Co. Inc, erroneously named as So's (USA) Company Inc., erroneously Sued As So's (USA) Company, Inc. (lc)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/12 11:57 AM
NOTICE NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
20 20 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 02/11 1:28 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/9/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2015 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 02/11 11:36 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Respondent So's (USA) Co. Inc filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky in Support of Petitioner's Request for Entry of Default Against So's (U.S.A.) Co., Inc. (etc.)
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
18 18 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/10 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION:The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing re MOTION for Hearing Hearing on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited12 , set for hearing on February 17, 2015. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Tue 02/10 11:31 AM
OBJECTION in opposition re: MOTION for Hearing Hearing on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award 12 filed by Respondent Madison One Acme Inc. (Sun, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by respondent Madison One Acme Inc, identifying Wina So. (Sun, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs answer Answer to Petition Tue 02/10 11:19 AM
ANSWER filed by respondent Madison One Acme Inc.(Attorney David Shentai Sun added to party Madison One Acme Inc(pty:res))(Sun, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 29, 2015
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 01/29 2:32 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited, upon Respondent So's (USA) Co. Inc served on 1/20/2015, answer due 2/10/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vivian So, Executive Assistant, Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entitysubstituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 01/29 2:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited, upon Respondent Madison One Acme Inc served on 1/20/2015, answer due 2/10/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vivian So, Executive Assistant, Person Apparently in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 20, 2015
12 12 motion Hearing Tue 01/20 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Hearing on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. Motion set for hearing on 2/17/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Cathy Wong,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of William Fan,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky Part 1,
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky Part 2,
Att: 5 Memorandum Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion and Petition,
Att: 7 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, January 15, 2015
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 01/15 9:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (case opening),1 as to defendants Madison One Acme Inc, So's (USA) Co. Inc. (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 14, 2015
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/14 4:44 PM
NOTICE filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. Notice of Errata to Petition By Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited To Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award (Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Summons Request Wed 01/14 3:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (case opening),1 filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Request for Issuance of Summons In a Civil Action; Declaration of Robert Petrokofsky
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 01/14 11:47 AM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause in writing by not later than February 2, 2015 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will consider the filing of the following as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause, on or before the above date:Proof of service of summons and complaint; (See order for further details). (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
7 7 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William A. Wilson, III on behalf of Petitioner, designating Robert Petrokofsky as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 30, 2014
6 6 APPLICATION for attorney William A. Wilson III to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-14706335 paid.) filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited.(Petrokofsky, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
Wednesday, October 08, 2014
5 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 02, 2014
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
1 1 125 pgs PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARDfiled against Madison One Acme Inc, So's (USA) Co. Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Petitioner Wong To Yick Wood Lock Ointment Limited. [Summons not Issued on 10/2/2014.] (et) (mg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 128 pgs (10/17/2014) Part 2,
Att: 2 (10/17/2014) Civil Cover Sheet