New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:23-cv-00935
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Terminated:Jun 20, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 5:24 AM EDT
Petitioner
ANDREAS ISAIAS
Represented By
ARI HIRSCH GOURVITZ
Gourvitz & Gourvitz LLC
contact info
ELLIOT H. GOURVITZ
Gourvitz & Gourvitz LLC
contact info
Respondent
YURI ALEXANDRA TORRES ARAQUE
60 Marion Ave.
Springfield, NJ 07081
Represented By
LISA PATRICIA PARKER
Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
58 58 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/27 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by YURI ALEXANDRA TORRES ARAQUE re53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re48 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ANDREAS ISAIAS(PARKER, LISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Respondent
57 57 respoth Affidavit in Opposition Wed 12/27 11:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re56 Objection to Report and Recommendations submitted by Respondent by ANDREAS ISAIAS.(GOURVITZ, ARI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Response to Respondent's Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Response to Respondent's letter