North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 7:23-cv-00145
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
CauseCamp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 6:57 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Timothy B. Walthall
Doj-Civ
contact info
Daniel Charles Eagles
Doj-Civ
contact info
Interested Party
Torts Branch USDOJ
Plaintiff
Susan Sheehan
Represented By
Randolph Lee
Bell Legal Group, PLLC
contact info
Eric W. Flynn
Bell Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/17 5:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Short Form against United States of America, filed by Susan Isabella Sheehan. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against United States of America, filed by Susan Sheehan. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Special Appearance Wed 10/18 9:21 AM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by James Edward Bell, III on behalf of Susan Sheehan. (Bell, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit Fri 10/13 9:42 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by Susan Sheehan. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Drop Box Receipt
order Text Order Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/13 10:08 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney James Edward Bell, III must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/13/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 08/31 1:02 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS an extension of time for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including October 2, 2023. Entered by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/31/2023. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 07/24 3:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS an extension of time for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including September 1, 2023. Entered by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/24/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/20 4:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS an extension of time for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including August 4, 2023. Entered by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/20/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/01 10:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS an extension of time for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead in response to plaintiff's complaint in all CLJA cases assigned to me through and including June 23, 2023. Entered by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/1/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 misc Transcript Thu 04/27 1:19 PM
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 5, 2023, before Judge James C. Dever III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy M. Condon. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Please review Attorney obligations regarding the redaction of electronic transcripts of court proceedings available on the court's[LINK:website] Redaction Request due 5/21/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2023. (Condon, A.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 04/27 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript10 Transcript. The parties have seven calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The parties must also serve a copy on the court reporter or transcriber. After filing the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, a party must submit to the court reporter or transcriber, within 21 calendar days of the filing of the transcript, a written statement indicating where the personal data identifiers to be redacted appear in the transcript. (Condon, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/17 10:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including May 31, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/17/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/14 3:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
8 8 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/05 4:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James C. Dever III in Raleigh: Status Conference held on 4/5/2023. Counsel present for all plaintiffs and the United States of America. Court addresses the massive number of potential cases and the ability of the four district judges of this court to resolve that number of cases. Court inquires of the United States regarding the number of claims filed and number resolved - Government responds. Court addresses how discovery should proceed in these cases. Counsel for the plaintiffs allowed time to speak - various issues discussed. Government notes need for relief regarding the hundreds of answers due in the next two months. Final comments made by the Court - written order anticipated to follow. (Court Reporter - Amy Condon) (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
7 7 4 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Hearings Tue 03/21 9:05 AM
Order Setting Hearing - Status Conference set for 4/5/2023 at 1:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/20/2023. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/03 1:18 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy B. Walthall on behalf of United States of America. (Walthall, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/24 4:02 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/22 2:58 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Randolph Lee on behalf of Susan Sheehan. (Lee, Randolph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 02/17 12:15 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Susan Sheehan (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/17 12:15 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric W. Flynn on behalf of Susan Sheehan. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/17 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6951864.), filed by Susan Sheehan. (Flynn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case Fri 02/17 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Herrmann, L.)
Related: [-]