Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-80212

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:23-ap-80023
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fenix Capital Funding, LLC
9265 4th Ave. 2nd Fl.
Brooklyn, NY 11209
Defendant
PNC Bank, National Association
its Registered Agent 641 South Lawrence Street
Montgomery, AL 36104
Plaintiff
Trades by Taylor LLC
8403 Camille Dr SE
Huntsville, AL 35802
Represented By
Stuart M Maples
Maples Law Firm, PC
contact info
Trustee
Kevin D. Heard (SBRA)
Heard, Ary & Dauro, LLC 303 Williams Avenue Suite 921
Huntsville, AL 35801


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, August 04, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/04 1:29 PM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-80023 Closed (dwh)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 22, 2023
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 07/22 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Friday, July 21, 2023
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/21/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Mooting
Thursday, July 20, 2023
29 29 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 07/20 12:11 PM
Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on 7/20/2023 Related [+]. (dwh)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
28 28 1 pgs order Order Mooting Wed 07/19 3:59 PM
Order Mooting Motion for Leave to Withdraw Signed on 7/19/2023 Related [+]. (ksv)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Withdrawal As Attorney filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC
Friday, July 07, 2023
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/07 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
25 25 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Wed 07/05 2:51 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 7/19/2023 at 11:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (dwh)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Withdrawal As Attorney filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC
Monday, July 03, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Withdrawal As Attorney Mon 07/03 5:05 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney Filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC. (Rowe, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 06/22 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 06/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
22 22 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Tue 06/20 3:06 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 7/19/2023 at 11:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (tcw)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC
21 21 court Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/20 10:22 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal By Trades by Taylor LLC and Between Fenix Capital Funding, LLC and PNC Bank Filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC. (Maples, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 03/09 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
18 18 court Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Tue 03/07 3:52 PM
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Related [+] Hearing scheduled 04/05/2023 at 11:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (scm)
Related: [-] Doc #13; Answer filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC
17 17 court Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Tue 03/07 3:51 PM
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling Related [+] Hearing scheduled 04/05/2023 at 11:00 AM at Decatur 3rd Floor (CRJ) Decatur. (scm)
Related: [-] Doc #6; Status Conference
16 16 order Continue Hearing Tue 03/07 3:50 PM
Order Approving Motion To Continue Hearing. Status Conference is continued to 4/5/23 at 11:00 a.m., 3rd Floor Courtroom, Decatur, Alabama. Related [+] Signed on 3/7/2023. (mmb)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Continue Hearing Tue 03/07 1:18 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC (Rowe, S.)
Related: [-] 14 Hearing Scheduled
14 14 court Hearing Scheduled Tue 03/07 10:08 AM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 3/15/2023 at 11:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (tcw)
Related: [-] 13 Answer filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 answer Answer Mon 03/06 9:39 AM
Answer Related [+] to the Complaint Filed by Defendant Fenix Capital Funding, LLC (Rowe, S.)
Related: [-] ;1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/01 9:21 AM
Summons Service Executed on PNC Bank, National Association 2/23/2023 (Maples, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 02/23 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/21 3:17 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Complaint by Trades by Taylor LLC against Fenix Capital Funding, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association. Fee Amount $350 filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC). (Maples, Stuart)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-80023 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)
9 9 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Tue 02/21 11:23 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing RE: Doc #6; Status Conference. Hearing scheduled 03/15/2023 at 11:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Bldg Huntsville (scm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 19, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 02/19 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 02/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Friday, February 17, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Fri 02/17 11:35 AM
Order Scheduling Telephonic Status Conference Signed on 2/17/2023. Status hearing to be held on 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (dwh)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 9:57 AM
Amended Complaint by Trades by Taylor LLC against Fenix Capital Funding, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association. (Maples, Stuart)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Issued Fri 02/17 9:06 AM
Summons Issued PNC Bank, National Association Date Issued 2/17/2023, Answer Due 3/20/2023 (dwh)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 02/17 9:04 AM
Summons Issued Fenix Capital Funding, LLC Date Issued 2/17/2023, Answer Due 3/20/2023 (dwh)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Incorrect Event (Notice of) Fri 02/17 8:47 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Stuart Maples, debtor's attorney, has aa chapter 12 case number on the Complaint when filing the Complaint. SOLUTION: The filer, Stuart Maples, debtor's attorney, should submit an amended Complaint with the ch 12 case number removed. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. Related [+] (dwh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Trades by Taylor LLC
Thursday, February 16, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/16 3:34 PM
Adversary case 23-80023 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) Complaint by Trades by Taylor LLC against Fenix Capital Funding, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association. Fee Amount $350 (Maples, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint