Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-07196

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:A Benjamin Goldgar
Case #: 1:23-ap-00034
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2023
Terminated:Jun 15, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rita Eneya Katsap
203 Blossom Ct.
Buffalo Grove, IL 60089
Represented By
Rita Eneya Katsap
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexander Katsap
Represented By
Michael K Desmond
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, June 15, 2023
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/15 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-34 Closed . (Molina, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
14 14 order Default Judgment Fri 06/02 2:33 PM
(E)Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 06/02/2023. (Castellano, Nancy)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 12, 2023
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 05/12 2:04 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 11:15 AM at Appear in Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Goldgar.. Signed on 05/12/2023. (Castellano, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 11, 2023
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/11 1:31 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Michael K Desmond on behalf of Alexander Katsap. Hearing scheduled for 6/2/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Goldgar. (Desmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In support
Att: 2 Affidavit Non-Military
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, April 14, 2023
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 04/14 2:12 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 11:15 AM at Appear in Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Goldgar, , , .. Signed on 04/14/2023. (O'Neal, Michelle)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, March 31, 2023
10 10 order Default Mon 04/03 9:35 AM
Order of Default Related [+]. Signed on 3/31/2023 (Rodarte, Aida)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 03/31 2:49 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 11:15 AM at Appear in Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Goldgar.. Signed on 03/31/2023. (Castellano, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
8 8 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Wed 03/01 4:11 PM
Amended Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Michael K Desmond on behalf of Alexander Katsap Related [+]. (Desmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/21 4:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on Rita Eneya Katsap Related [+]. (Desmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
6 6 utility U - Corrective Entry - Incorrect Missing Petition/Complaint Tue 02/21 9:58 AM
Corrective Entry - Incorrect/Missing AP Complaint, Filer notified to refile Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, February 17, 2023
5 5 cmp Adversary Complaint to correct Complaint PDF Fri 02/17 11:26 AM
Adversary Complaint to correct Complaint PDF by Michael K Desmond on behalf of Alexander Katsap against Rita Eneya Katsap. Related [+]. (Desmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
4 4 utility U - Corrective Entry - Incorrect Missing Petition/Complaint Fri 02/17 11:18 AM
Corrective Entry - Incorrect/Missing AP Complaint, Filer notified to refile Related [+]. (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 16, 2023
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 02/16 3:43 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-00034 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45755297. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Desmond, Michael) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/16 3:41 PM
Summons Issued on Rita Eneya Katsap Answer Due 03/20/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/16 3:41 PM
Adversary case 23-00034 (61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)), (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Alexander Katsap against Rita Eneya Katsap. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 3/31/2023 at 11:15 AM at Appear In Courtroom 642, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Goldgar. (Desmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet