New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:23-cv-01302
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Luis Abreu
Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC 80 Broad Street, 24th Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Constantinos James Tsanatelis
contact info
Scott L. Haworth
Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Mauricio Callelandin
Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC 80 Broad Street, 24th Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Constantinos James Tsanatelis
contact info
Scott L. Haworth
Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kalle Trucking LLC
Morris Duffy Alonso Faley & Pitcoff 101 Greenwich Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10006
Represented By
Vincent D. Finnegan
Callan, Koster, Brady & Brennan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
On Time Logistics Services, LLC
Donohue Law Firm, P.C. 745 5th Ave., 5th Floor
New York, NY 10151
Defendant
UNFI Transport, LLC
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Defendant
United Natural Foods, Inc.
313 Iron Hourse Way
Providence, RI 02908
Plaintiff
Arcenio Arcangel
Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek 80 Pine Street, 38th Floor
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Nicholas Elefterakis
Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek P.C.
contact info
Mark Travis Newman
Elefterakis, Elefterakis, & Panek
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 01, 2024
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/01 2:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The52 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Nina R. Morrison on 8/1/2024. (AD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
52 52 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/31 3:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Luis Abreu, Mauricio Callelandin (Haworth, Scott)
Related: [-]