Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:23-cv-02065
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 5:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Great Lakes Services, LLC
Represented By
Rosalee Miller McNamara
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Kurt F. Ellison
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Farrah N.W. Rifelj
Michael Best & Friedrich LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Canale
Represented By
Brad K. Thoenen
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info
John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Hkm Employment Attorneys, LLP
contact info
Kevin Todd
Hkm Employment Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 16, 2023
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/16 6:04 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice by Richard Canale. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
32 32 order Administratively Closing Case Wed 09/13 1:45 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 11/30/2023. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/13/2023. (kas)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Wed 09/13 1:30 PM
ORDER denying as moot22 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Due to the parties notice of settlement the court denies this motion as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/01 10:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Set of Written Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Great Lakes Services, LLC. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/25 3:10 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Richard Canale re:22 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint(Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 24, 2023
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/24 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Continued Deposition of Plaintiff Richard Canale by Great Lakes Services, LLC (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 08/11 10:08 PM
RESPONSE by Defendant Great Lakes Services, LLC re22 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT(McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. Exh. 1,
Att: 2 Ex. Exh. 2,
Att: 3 Ex. Exh. 3,
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Kurt F. Ellison
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
26 26 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 08/09 10:09 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Canale of taking deposition of Lori Byrne on August 17, 2023 (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 08/09 10:07 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Canale of taking deposition of Alex Matthews on August 17, 2023 (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 08/09 10:06 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Canale of taking deposition of Maria Elena Martin Del Campo on August 16, 2023 (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 08/09 10:04 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Canale of taking deposition of Carys Smiley on August 16, 2023 (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
22 22 motion Leave to Amend Complaint Mon 07/31 12:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff Richard Canale Related [+](Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Monday, July 24, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/24 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Great Lakes Services, LLC. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/26 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Discovery Requests by Richard Canale. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
19 19 order Order ~Util - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 06/20 2:00 PM
Order regarding mediation. Having reviewed the parties' confidential settlement reports, the court does not believe that court-ordered mediation would likely be a productive use of the parties' resources at this time. Accordingly, the court vacates the September 1, 2023 mediation deadline set forth in the scheduling order. (ECF 13, at 2-3.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
18 18 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 06/08 5:36 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Great Lakes Services, LLC of taking deposition of Richard Canale on June 15, 2023. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 06/08 9:11 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard Canale of taking deposition of Terry Green on June 16, 2023. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/25 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure Documents (D000085-D000175) by Great Lakes Services, LLC. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/11 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Written Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Great Lakes Services, LLC. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/11 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures and D000001-D000084 by Great Lakes Services, LLC. (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/09 11:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: estimated trial time 4 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 6/9/2023. Mediation deadline 9/1/2023. Discovery deadline 10/13/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 12/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/9/2023. (ht)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/09 11:21 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/04 11:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests by Richard Canale. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
10 10 motion Protective Order Mon 05/01 9:40 AM
DISREGARD FILING. FILED IN WRONG CASE. Modified on 5/1/2023 (ht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/12 8:41 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kurt F. Ellison for Great Lakes Services, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/12 8:39 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Farrah N.W. Rifelj for Great Lakes Services, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/11 4:56 PM
MOTION for attorney Kurt Ellison to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6034642.) by Defendant Great Lakes Services, LLC Related [+](McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion - Kurt Ellison,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form PHV Electronic Filing Registration Form
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/11 4:51 PM
MOTION for attorney Farrah N.W. Rifelj to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6034631.) by Defendant Great Lakes Services, LLC Related [+](McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion - Farrah N.W. Rifelj,
Att: 2 ECF Registration Form PHV Electronic Filing Registration Form
Friday, March 31, 2023
5 5 order Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling Fri 03/31 2:17 PM
INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2023 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 4/18/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/28/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 4/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/31/2023. (ht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 3:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Lakes Services, LLC identifying None as corporate parent (McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/15 2:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses to Complaint by Great Lakes Services, LLC.(McNamara, Rosalee)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/17 2:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Richard Canale. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 02/17 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5990582.), filed by Richard Canale. (Todd, Kevin)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 02/17 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 02/17 3:55 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Great Lakes Services, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
Related: [-]