USA v. Kilgore
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 5:23-cr-00019 |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 2:27 AM EST |
Defendant
David Shawn Kilgore, Jr. (1)
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/18/2023 3:31 AM EST |
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
Conflict Check run. (DC) | ||
1 | 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to David Shawn Kilgore, Jr (1) count(s) 1-3. Forfeiture Allegations not counted statistically and do not appear on the front of the docket sheet. (DC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/17/2023) (STC). | |
2 | 2 SEALED UNREDACTED Indictment re1 Indictment by USA as to David Shawn Kilgore, Jr. (DC) | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to David Shawn Kilgore, Jr. (DC) |