Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00022
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2023 2:36 AM EST
Defendant
Justin Ernest Riggs (1)
Represented By
Craig M Kadish
Craig M Kadish And Associates LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christine Goo
Doj-Usao
contact info
Sean R Delaney
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Leo Joseph Wise
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Jan 15 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Defendant's Motion for Release from Custody Pending Trial as to Justin Ernest Riggs (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/15/2025. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 03/03/2023 9:09 AM EST
Monday, January 09, 2023
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Justin Ernest Riggs (1). (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit In Support of Criminal Complaint
3 3 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Justin Ernest Riggs. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to Justin Ernest Riggs (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 1/6/2023. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Partially Unseal Criminal Complaint by USA as to Justin Ernest Riggs. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Partially Unseal Criminal Complaint as to Justin Ernest Riggs (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/9/2023. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
7 7 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Justin Ernest Riggs5 MOTION to Partially Unseal Criminal Complaint filed by USA (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Initial Appearance as to Justin Ernest Riggs (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 1/9/2023 before Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson.(FTR Gold; Telita Davis, Courtroom 7B.) (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Justin Ernest Riggs. Detention Hearing set for 1/13/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/9/2023. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER pursuant to Fed R Crim P 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act as to Justin Ernest Riggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/9/2023. (td4s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
11 11 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Craig M Kadish as Retained Counsel appearing for Justin Ernest Riggs(Kadish, Craig) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Sean R Delaney appearing for USA.(Delaney, Sean) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
13 13 Detention Hearing as to Justin Ernest Riggs held on 1/13/2023 before Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson.(FTR Gold, CRD: Caitlyn Wilson CTRM: 7B) (cw6s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Justin Ernest Riggs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson on 1/13/2023. (cw6s, Deputy Clerk) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to Justin Ernest Riggs. (Goo, Christine) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
16 16 PROPOSED SEALED DOCUMENT (Goo, Christine) [1:23-mj-00095-MJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
17 17 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to Justin Ernest Riggs (1) count(s) 1, 2-9, 10. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]