California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 4:23-cv-00770
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2023 2:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Workday, Inc.
Represented By
Kayla Delgado Grundy
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Justin Washington
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Julie Ann Totten
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Erin M. Connell
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Mobley
Represented By
Roderick Twain Cooks
Winston Cooks, LLC
contact info
Lee David Winston
Winston Cooks, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/28 4:12 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
38 38 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 11/27 1:53 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Rita F. Lin in the San Francisco Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials RFL immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. All pending motions Related [+] must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Lin by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court’s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after March 4, 2024 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before March 4, 2024, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. Each party is expected to review and become familiar with all applicable standing orders and scheduling notes. 9. On or before December 11, 2023 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address the following items in the following order: a. Date Filed : The date the case was filed; b. Parties : A list or description of each party; c. Claims : A summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims; d. Facts : A brief chronology of the facts and a statement of the principal factual issues in dispute; e. Legal Issues : A brief statement, without extended legal argument, of the disputed points of law, including reference to specific statutes and decisions; f. Relief : A description of the relief sought and the damages claimed with an explanation as to how damages have been (or will be) computed; g. Discovery : The status of discovery, including any significant discovery management issues, as well as any limits or cutoff dates; h. Related Cases : The status, case name, and case number of any related cases or proceedings pending before another judge of this court, or before another court or administrative body; i. Procedural History : A procedural history of the case, including any previous motions that were decided or submitted, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded, any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded, and any previous referral to a magistrate judge; j. Deadlines : A description of any other deadlines in place before reassignment, including those for ADR, dispositive motions, pretrial conferences, and trials; k. Any modification of deadlines : Any requested modification of these dates, and the reasons for the request; l. Consent to Magistrate : Whether the parties will consent to a magistrate judge for trial; and m. Emergency : Whether there exists an immediate need for a case management conference to be scheduled in the action, and why the parties believe such a need exists. 10. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. 11. The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. Hearings and trials in any civil case assigned to a judge participating in the Pilot Project are eligible for video recording, upon request and with the consent of the parties and the presiding judge. Please see the [LINK:Northern Districts webpage about participation in the Pilot Project] and [LINK:General Order 65] for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 11/27/2023 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] gardless of whether they are presently scheduled for hearing
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
37 37 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 09/27 9:14 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Motion to Dismiss Hearing previously set for 10/10/2023 is vacated, it will be reset by the Court if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
36 36 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 09/25 5:31 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed byWorkday, Inc.. (Totten, Julie)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
35 35 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 09/25 5:05 PM
REPLY Related [+] in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed byWorkday, Inc.. (Totten, Julie)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Thursday, September 14, 2023
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 09/14 9:35 AM
Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 31 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates. Case Management Conference previously set for 10/2/2023 is vacated and will be reset by the Court. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
33 33 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 09/13 5:11 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Corrected Copy with Cover Page filed byDerek Mobley.(Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice
32 32 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 09/13 5:02 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byDerek Mobley.(Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 09/13 10:17 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates filed by Workday, Inc.. (Totten, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
30 30 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Tue 09/12 2:01 PM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Sat 09/02 6:54 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re:17 Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. You are hereby notified that the motion to dismiss hearing previously set for 9/12/2023 is reset to 10/10/2023 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
28 28 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/31 12:30 PM
Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 26 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/31 12:28 PM
Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 25 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/30 3:41 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18602131.) filed by Derek Mobley.(Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
25 25 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/30 12:08 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18600696.) filed by Derek Mobley.(Winston, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, August 17, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 08/17 11:31 PM
Miscellaneous Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's counsel to secure local counsel by 8/30/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/14 1:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Additional Time to Secure Local Counsel filed by Derek Mobley. (Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/01 3:36 PM
MISCELLANEOUS ORDER. Plaintiff's Application with Local Counsel due by 8/16/2023. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/1/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
21 21 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 07/31 11:30 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Derek Mobley . (Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/25 12:31 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/25 7:18 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Derek Mobley.(Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Roderick T. Cooks,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
18 18 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 07/17 2:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Workday, Inc. (Totten, Julie)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 07/17 2:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Workday, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/31/2023. Replies due by 8/7/2023.(Totten, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Workday, Inc.s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Workday Inc.s Motion to Dismiss
Monday, May 15, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 05/15 8:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 29, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/12 9:25 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 5/12/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/21 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT against WORKDAY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18008535.). Filed byDerek Mobley.(Winston, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet