Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Referred: Laura D Hatcher
Case #: 1:23-cv-00183
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Terminated:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Archetype Crypto II, LLC
Represented By
Bethany Lobo
contact info
Rebecca Tarneja
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Keller
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Circle Internet Financial, LLC
Represented By
Ian Robert Liston
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC
contact info
John P. Flynn
contact info
Colleen Bal
contact info
Joshua A. Baskin
contact info
Defendant
Coinbase, Inc.
Represented By
Felipe Corredor
contact info
Mark R. Conrad
contact info
Anthony Michael Calvano
Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Adam Dylan Gold
Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP
contact info
Defendant
Connext Labs, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Mortenson
contact info
Jeffrey L. Moyer
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Jack McNeily
contact info
Serrin Turner
contact info
Nathalie Anne Freeman
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Defendant
Illusory Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Ben Au
contact info
Melissa Levin
contact info
Anne Shea Gaza
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Lauren Kessler
contact info
Douglas H. Meal
Orrick, Herrington, And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ozone Networks, Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca Lyn Butcher
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Valerie L. Hletko
contact info
Jennifer L. Cree
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Dillon H. Grimm
contact info
Andrew Soukup
contact info
Defendant
Polychain Alchemy, LLC
Represented By
Jared Gerber
contact info
Samuel Levander
contact info
Rachel R. Tunney
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
William M. Lafferty
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Thomas Parker Will
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Roger A. Cooper
contact info
Defendant
Consensys Mesh
Represented By
Gregory N. Wolfe
contact info
Matthew D. Gauthier
contact info
Tibor L. Nagy, Jr.
contact info
Michael A. Barlow
Abrams & Bayliss LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ethereal Ventures I Partners L.P.
Represented By
Gregory N. Wolfe
contact info
Matthew D. Gauthier
contact info
Tibor L. Nagy, Jr.
contact info
Michael A. Barlow
Abrams & Bayliss LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mannu Singh
Represented By
Jason Harrow
contact info
Kurt M. Heyman
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Marisa R. De Feo
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Jamie Crooks
contact info
Neil K. Sawhney
contact info
Emily Gerrick
contact info
Dominick T. Gattuso
Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP
contact info
Michelle Streifthau-Livizos
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Charles Gerstein
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Consensys Software, Inc.
Terminated: 06/05/2023
Represented By
Gregory N. Wolfe
contact info
Matthew D. Gauthier
contact info
Tibor L. Nagy, Jr.
contact info
Michael A. Barlow
Abrams & Bayliss LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
149 149 order SO ORDERED Tue 04/22 3:25 PM
SO ORDERED, re147 Stipulation To Extend the Stay until May 21, 2025 filed by Mannu Singh. Signed by Judge Laura D. Hatcher on 4/22/25. (kjk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
148 148 discov Notice of Service Fri 04/18 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Illusory Systems, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories filed by Illusory Systems, Inc..(Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
147 147 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Wed 04/16 4:40 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Pending Settlement by Mannu Singh. (Gattuso, Dominick)
Related: [-]