New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:23-cv-00967
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Federal Question-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2023
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Case in other court:Third Circuit, 23-02598
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 16, 2023 5:22 AM EDT
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Ave. NW Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001
Represented By
JOHN MICHAEL MIANO
contact info
Defendant
PHILLIP D. MURPHY
in his official capacity as Governor of the State of New Jersey 225 West State Street
Trenton, NJ 08650
Represented By
DAVID CHEN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
JEREMY FEIGENBAUM
Office Of The New Jersey Attorney General
contact info
NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
New Jersey Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
MATTHEW J. PLATKIN
in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of New Jersey 25 Market Street
Trenton, NJ 08611
Represented By
DAVID CHEN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
JEREMY FEIGENBAUM
Office Of The New Jersey Attorney General
contact info
NATHANIEL ILAN LEVY
New Jersey Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
STEPHEN EHRLICH
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
CORECIVIC, INC.
5501 Virginia Way
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
DAVID J. GOLDSMITH
Schlam Stone & Dolan Llpschlam Stone & Dolan LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2023
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 8/29/2023. (mlh)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 13, 2025
55 55 order Order of Dismissal Mon 01/13 2:46 PM
TEXT ORDER : This matter comes before the Court upon a review of its dockets. Pursuant to this Court's Opinion and Order (ECF Nos.50 ,51 ) issued on August 29, 2023, the Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE this matter pending appeal. ( See ECF No.53 ). So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 01/13/2025. (pdm)
Related: [-]