New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:23-cv-01429
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983vp Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2023 6:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Samantha Holsborg
Defendant
Millbrook Central School District
Represented By
Caroline Beth Lineen
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Millbrook Central School District Board of Education
Represented By
Caroline Beth Lineen
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Laura Mitchell
Represented By
Caroline Beth Lineen
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Eric Seipp
Represented By
Caroline Beth Lineen
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Teacher Samantha Holsborg
Represented By
Caroline Beth Lineen
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Superintendent Laura Mitchell
Defendant
Principal Eric Seipp
Plaintiff
A.F.
Represented By
Kathryn A Hettler
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie
contact info
Hillary Mara Nappi
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Carolyn Fish
Represented By
Hillary Mara Nappi
Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
51 51 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 05/03 4:49 PM
ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the Court finds the settlement is fair and reasonable to A.F. Therefore, plaintiff's motion for an order approving the settlement is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is dismissed. The Clerk is instructed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/3/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
50 50 order Order on Motion to Seal Tue 04/30 12:40 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part47 Letter Motion to Seal: For the reasons set forth in plaintiff's counsel's letter-motion (Doc. #47), the request to seal the following documents is GRANTED: Declaration of Hillary Nappi, Esq. and Exhibits B, C, and D thereto, and Declaration of Carolyn Fish. (Docs. ##48, 48-2, 48-3, 48-4, 49). The request to seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Hillary Nappi, Esq. is DENIED as Exhibit A is a copy of the First Amended Complaint, which was filed on the public docket. (Doc. #25). The Clerk is instructed to place Docs. ##48, 48-2, 48-3, 48-4, and 49 under seal so they remain restricted to court users and the parties. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (kmk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
49 49 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/29 7:39 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Carolyn Fish in Support re:47 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Hillary Nappi, Esq. dated April 29, 2024.. Document filed by Carolyn Fish, A.F., Samantha Holsborg(in their official capacity), Samantha Holsborg(in her individual capacity), Millbrook Central School District, Millbrook Central School District Board of Education, Laura Mitchell, Laura Mitchell, Eric Seipp(in his individual capacity), Eric Seipp(in their official capacity). Motion or Order to File Under Seal:47 .(Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-]
48 48 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 04/29 7:37 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Hillary Nappi, Esq. in Support re:47 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Hillary Nappi, Esq. dated April 29, 2024.. Document filed by Carolyn Fish, A.F., Samantha Holsborg(in their official capacity), Samantha Holsborg(in her individual capacity), Millbrook Central School District, Millbrook Central School District Board of Education, Laura Mitchell, Laura Mitchell, Eric Seipp(in his individual capacity), Eric Seipp(in their official capacity).Motion or Order to File Under Seal:47 .(Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Retainer Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit Expenses
47 47 motion Seal Mon 04/29 7:30 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Hillary Nappi, Esq. dated April 29, 2024. Document filed by Carolyn Fish..(Nappi, Hillary)
Related: [-]