California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-mc-00025
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2023
Re-opened:Aug 28, 2023
Terminated:Mar 09, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
29 29 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/01 8:25 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: Case should have been closed on entry dated 10/1/2024 28 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es)
Related: [-]
28 28 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 10/01 7:26 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: In its status report, Dkt. No. 27, applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. states that QuadraNet has produced the requested information in its possession and requests the Court close the case. Having considered the report, the Court vacates the October 4 status conference and orders the clerk to close this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 09/27 4:51 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.'s Motion to Reopen Case and Compel Discovery From QuadraNet Enterprises LLC filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/03 5:02 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: After nearly a year without any action in the case, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint report stating whether Quadranet has complied with the subpoena 24 . Mizuho now states that Quadranet has yet to comply with the subpoena and requests this Court allow Mizuho time to file a further status report on the status of Quadranet's compliance25 . More than a year has passed since the Court granted Mizuho's motion to reopen and compel discovery--clearly more than enough time for compliance with the subpoena. Quadranet's apparent failure to do so is troubling; Mizuho's apparent failure to take action raises concerns as well. The parties shall either resolve this matter or file a request for relief--which may include an appropriate request for sanctions--by no later than 10/2/2024. An in-person Status Conference is set for 10/4/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Each party shall appear through counsel and shall be accompanied by a company representative who has detailed knowledge about the production efforts to date. Failure to timely comply may result in sanctions. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 08/30 4:35 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.'s Motion to Reopen Case and Compel Discovery From QuadraNet Enterprises LLC filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
24 24 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 08/21 7:29 AM
(In Chambers) Order by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On August 28, 2023, the Court ordered Defendant to produce Plaintiff's requested documents by September 15, 2023. Dkt. No. 22. On September 21, 2023, Plaintiff submitted a report stating that Defendant had made an incomplete production. Dkt. No. 23. By August 30, 2024, the parties shall submit a joint report stating whether Defendant has fully produced the requested documents. If Defendant has produced the requested documents, the Court shall order the Clerk to close this matter. If not, the parties shall explain why this case should not be closed in any event for failure to take any action in almost a year. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 09/21 1:59 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.'s Motion to ReOpen Case and Compel Discovery from QuadraNet Enterprises LLC filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
22 22 order For Order Tue 08/29 9:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART MIZUHO FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.'S MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM QUADRANET ENTERPRISES LLC20 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: QuadraNet has failed to oppose Mizuho's motion to compel, which may be construed as consent to the granting the motion. Therefore, the Court reopens the case and compels QuadraNet to produce those documents requested that are in its possession, custody, or control by no later than 9/15/2023. Because the Court expects compliance with this order, QuadraNet is not required to produce a declaration attesting to its search protocol. Mizuho is to file a status report on 9/21/2023. In light of the Court's ruling, the hearing on the motion is vacated. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/17 3:24 PM
Notice filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. /Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to its Motion to Reopen Case and Compel Discovery from QuadraNet Enterprises LLC [Dkt. 20] (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
20 20 motion Reopen Case Mon 07/24 6:39 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Reopen Case /Mizuho Financial Group's Notice of Motion and Motion to Reopen Case and Compel Discovery from QuadraNet Enterprises LLC filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/1/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Alexis Bastian Cruz added to party Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.(pty:inre)) (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Tatiana Markel in Support,
Att: 9 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 09, 2023
19 19 order For Order re Discovery Matter Mon 03/13 7:24 AM
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1782 TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY FOR USE IN A FOREIGN PROCEEDING by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is granted leave to issue and serve a subpoena on QuadraNet Enterprises LLC containing the substance and form of the subpoena attached as Exhibit 2 to the Application1 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
18 18 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/09 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Shade I. Quailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., designating Alexis B. Cruz as local counsel13 . (gk)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/09 8:12 AM
ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., designating Alexis B. Cruz as local counsel14 . (gk)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/09 8:03 AM
ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., designating Alexis B. Cruz as local counsel15 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 03/06 11:05 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/27/2023, Receipt No. 34863308) filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 03, 2023
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 03/03 12:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34892816) filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 03/03 10:53 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shade I. Quailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34890912) filed by Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
12 12 order Striking Filed Documents (CV-80) Wed 03/01 4:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiences11 , the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863308)9 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shade I. Quailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863368)10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863008)8 . (jgr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 03/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863308)9 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shade I. Quailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863368)10 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863008)8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. The applicant must also attach a Certificate of Good Standing (issued within the last 30 days) from every state bar to which he or she is admitted; failure to do so will be grounds for denying the application. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 02/27 4:22 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shade I. Quailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863368) filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 02/27 4:18 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863308) filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 02/27 4:14 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioner Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34863008) filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 02/27 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tatiana Markel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 02/27 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Shade I Quailey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 02/27 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Oren J. Warshavsky. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/27 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 02/27 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event was selected. The correct event is MISC - Receipt of Letters Rogatory (Incoming Request for Foreign Judicial Assistance). In the future please use the correct event. (car)
Related: [-]
attorney Pay Filing Fee Mon 02/27 11:02 AM
FILING FEE PAID for new miscellaneous case. Receipt No. ACACDC-34858554 for $49 filing fee. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 02/22 3:17 PM
Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.'s Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil Local Rule 7.1 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc., identifying Mizuho Bank Ltd., which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.. (Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs motion Order re Discovery Matter Wed 02/22 3:09 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for to Conduct Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 filed by Applicant Mizuho Financial Group, Inc..(Attorney Alexis Bastian Cruz added to party Mizuho Financial Group, Inc.(pty:inre))(Cruz, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Ex Parte Application - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Ex Parte Application - Subpoena,
Att: 3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support,
Att: 4 Declaration of Ryohei Kudo in Support,
Att: 5 Proposed Order