Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:23-cv-00270
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2023 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
SEAN ANDERSON
Represented By
Francis D. Wymard
William J. Ferren & Associates
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF NEW CASTLE
Represented By
Francis D. Wymard
William J. Ferren & Associates
contact info
Defendant
NICK MASCIO
Represented By
Francis D. Wymard
William J. Ferren & Associates
contact info
Defendant
ERIC RITTER
Represented By
Francis D. Wymard
William J. Ferren & Associates
contact info
Evaluator
HOWARD J. SCHULBERG
Schulberg Mediation LLC 515 Hamilton Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205
Represented By
Howard J. Schulberg
Schulberg Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD BROWN
Represented By
Elizabeth Tuttle
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Joel S. Sansone
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Massimo A. Terzigni
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Plaintiff
VALERIE SALVATORE
Represented By
Elizabeth Tuttle
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Joel S. Sansone
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Massimo A. Terzigni
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 01/31 7:10 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/31/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Wed 01/31 4:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
27 27 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/16 11:01 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Cancel Status Conference26 . It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Status Conference scheduled for January 18, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. before The Honorable Marilyn J. Horan is hereby cancelled. It is further ordered that, in light of the amicable resolution, the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before February 16, 2024 or a joint status report on the expected filing of the same. (modified from proposed order). Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/16/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Status Conference Tue 01/16 4:56 PM
Amended MOTION for Status Conference by SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/18 11:59 AM
ORDER Defendants' Motion for Status Conference is Granted. Said status conference is scheduled for the 18th day of January, 2024 in Courtroom 8A at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs and a Representative for Defendant shall be personally present with counsel. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/18/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Proposed Order Mon 12/18 10:13 AM
Proposed Order re23 Motion for Status Conference by SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Mon 12/18 9:40 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re23 Motion for Status Conference. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
23 23 motion Status Conference Fri 12/15 11:58 AM
MOTION for Status Conference by SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
22 22 adr Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 08/14 2:13 PM
Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation by HOWARD J. SCHULBERG. Early Neutral Evaluation Date 10/9/2023 (Schulberg, Howard)
Related: [-]
21 21 3 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Mon 08/14 1:56 PM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/14/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 08/14 1:55 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Howard Schulberg is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/14/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
19 19 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 08/14 1:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, an Initial Case Management Conference having been held on 8/9/2023, the following deadlines are set: Rule 26(a) Disclosures due 8/23/2023; Joinder of Additional Parties due 8/30/2023; Amended Pleadings due 9/6/2023; Fact Discovery due 2/9/2024. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Chambers staff will provide Counsel with information for accessing the Video Conference in advance. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report to the Court by 2/8/2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/14/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
18 18 minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Wed 08/09 9:26 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference was held on 8/9/2023. A Case Management Order, Order Referring Case to ADR, and Order Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) to follow. (Court Reporter: Jane Proud) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Wed 08/02 9:31 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 08/02 9:29 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/11 11:07 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER, a Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/9/2023 at 09:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall refer to7 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. The Rule 26(f) Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 8/2/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Rule 26(f) Report of Parties,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Stipulation Selecting ADR Process
Friday, July 07, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/07 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 05/08 2:51 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from SEAN ANDERSON on 7/8/2023; CITY OF NEW CASTLE on 7/8/2023; NICK MASCIO on 7/8/2023; ERIC RITTER on 7/8/2023 (jd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/05 11:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC RITTER, NICK MASCIO, SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE. All Defendants. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/25 8:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francis D. Wymard on behalf of SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER. (Wymard, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 02/27 8:11 AM
Summons Issued as to SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Friday, February 24, 2023
10 10 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Fri 02/24 4:59 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Fri 02/24 4:27 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for TRO, pending further order of court. Defendant City of New Castle ("City") is hereby restrained from demolishing Plaintiffs' home, located at 712 Cumberland Avenue, New Castle, Pennsylvania 16101. The Court finds that under the circumstances alleged that no security is required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(c). Counsel shall serve this Order upon Defendants and/or their counsel. Once Defendants have been served, either party may move for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/24/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Telephonic Status Conference Fri 02/24 4:23 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic Status Conference addressing Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 2/24/2023. After receiving notice this afternoon of the case reassignment, the Court scheduled the within status conference. Counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Court staff attempted to advise the solicitor for the City of New Castle and left counsel a voicemail, but he did not appear. An ex parte proceeding under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b) was held to address Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. A separate order on the Motion will follow. (Court Reporter: Jane Proud) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Fri 02/24 3:18 PM
AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/24 3:15 PM
TEXT ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/24/2023 at 04:00 PM. Call-in instructions to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/24/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 02/24 12:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/24/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/24 1:47 PM
Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding. (ctb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/23 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/23 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 02/22 5:04 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 02/22 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against SEAN ANDERSON, CITY OF NEW CASTLE, NICK MASCIO, ERIC RITTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7549446), filed by RICHARD BROWN, VALERIE SALVATORE. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet