New Mexico District Court
Case #: 5:23-mj-00341
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Feb 23, 2023 12:18 AM MST
Defendant
Amanda Flores (1)
Represented By
Peter J. Giovannini
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Ellison
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2023 12:42 AM MST
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
Arrest (Rule 5) of Amanda Flores (cer) Modified text on 2/22/2023 (cer).
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5 Documents Received as to Amanda Flores (cer) Modified text on 2/22/2023 (cer).
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara S. Evans: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Amanda Flores held on 2/21/2023. Identity/Detention Hearing to be set on 2/27/2023 at 9:00am. Related [+] (cer) Modified text on 2/22/2023 (cer).
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Roswell
3 3 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Barbara S. Evans (cer) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Peter J. Giovannini for Amanda Flores by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (kls) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
Related: [-]