California Eastern District Court
Judge:Ana De Alba
Referred: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Case #: 1:23-cv-00260
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2023 3:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Victoria Bramble
Defendant
Agela Hill
Defendant
Royal Properties
Plaintiff
Duchun Lafre Goodwin
2881 E. Huntington Blvd.
Fresno, CA 93721

GPO Apr 20 2023
ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/19/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
GPO Apr 25 2023
SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/25/2023. First Amended Complaint due by 5/26/2023. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint Form). (Lawrence, A)
GPO Aug 24 2023
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 08/23/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
GPO Oct 23 2023
ORDER ADOPTING 8 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 10/20/2023. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 03, 2023
misc Mail Returned Fri 11/03 1:56 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not Deliverable as Addressed:10 Judgment,9 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations sent to Duchun Lafre Goodwin at 2881 E. Huntington Blvd., Fresno, CA 93721. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
10 10 order Judgment Mon 10/23 10:18 AM
JUDGMENT dated *10/23/2023* pursuant to order. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/23 10:16 AM
ORDER ADOPTING8 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 10/20/2023. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Mon 10/23 10:19 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Judgment,9 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
misc Mail Returned Wed 09/06 9:24 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward:8 Findings and Recommendations sent to Duchun Lafre Goodwin at 2881 E. Huntington Blvd, Fresno, CA 93721. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
8 8 motion Findings and Recommendations Thu 08/24 9:17 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 08/23/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 08/24 9:18 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/02 7:43 AM
EX PARTE MOTION to set Aside Default Judgment by Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
6 6 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 05/30 2:36 PM
MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES by Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 05/25 8:30 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Duchun Lafre Goodwin.(Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
misc Mail Returned Mon 05/08 10:55 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward:4 Order sent to Duchun Goodwin at 2881 E. Huntington Blvd., Fresno, CA 93721. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
misc Mail Returned Wed 05/03 2:51 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Insufficient Address:3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis sent to Duchun Lafre Goodwin at 2881 E. Huntington Blvd. Fresno, CA 93721. Notice of Change of Address due by 7/10/2023. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
4 4 6 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/25 1:17 PM
SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/25/2023. First Amended Complaint due by 5/26/2023 .. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint Form
service Service by Mail Tue 04/25 1:17 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order served on Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Lawrence, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 04/20 8:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 4/19/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 04/20 8:26 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
misc IFP Application Wed 02/22 12:18 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/22 12:17 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Duchun Lafre Goodwin. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/22 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Victoria Bramble, Agela Hill, Royal Properties by Duchun Lafre Goodwin.(Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]