California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00770
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 20, 2023 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Workday, Inc.
Represented By
Kayla Delgado Grundy
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Julie Ann Totten
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Justin Washington
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Erin M. Connell
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Mobley
Represented By
Roderick Twain Cooks
Winston Cooks, LLC
contact info
Lee David Winston
Winston Cooks, LLC
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2023
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2023. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/2023. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
125 125 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/08 5:21 PM
Proposed Order re124 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Parties' Joint Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute by Workday, Inc.. (Grundy, Kayla)
Related: [-]
124 124 motion Discovery Letter Brief Thu 05/08 4:40 PM
Joint Discovery Letter Brief Parties' Joint Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Derek Mobley. (Wiggins, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
123 123 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 9:15 AM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ann Wiggins. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
122 122 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 11:42 AM
NOTICE by Derek Mobley Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms(Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Opt-In as a Plaintiff for Faithlinh Rowe
121 121 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 05/02 10:36 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Grundy, Kayla)
Related: [-]
120 120 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 10:03 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on April 29, 2025, before Judge Rita F. Lin. Court Reporter Kendra Steppler, telephone number 406-489-3498, email address kendra_steppler@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2025. (Steppler, Kendra)
Related: [-] 115 Transcript Order (s)115
119 119 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 9:34 AM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer Wiggins Smith. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
118 118 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 9:11 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice For Ann K. Wiggins ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20633400.) filed by Derek Mobley.(Wiggins, Ann)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ann K. Wiggins Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, May 01, 2025
117 117 misc Transcript Order Thu 05/01 7:55 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/2025 before Judge Rita F. Lin by Derek Mobley, for Court Reporter Kendra Steppler. (Cooks, Roderick)
Related: [-]
116 116 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:39 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission Of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Wiggins Smith ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20630491.) filed by Derek Mobley.(Smith, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Smith Certificate of Good Standing