Original Case: 5:22-cv-00058

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00218
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit210 Real Property - Land Condemnation
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Feb 23, 2023 3:26 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
City of South Burlington
Represented By
Pietro Lynn
Lynn, Lynn, Blackman & Manitsky, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
South Burlington City Council
Represented By
Pietro Lynn
Lynn, Lynn, Blackman & Manitsky, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Meaghan Emery
Represented By
Pietro Lynn
Lynn, Lynn, Blackman & Manitsky, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Timothy Barritt
Represented By
Pietro Lynn
Lynn, Lynn, Blackman & Manitsky, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Helen Riehle
Represented By
Pietro Lynn
Lynn, Lynn, Blackman & Manitsky, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
835 Hinesburg Road, LLC
Represented By
Matthew B. Byrne
Gravel & Shea PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2023 3:20 AM EST
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant 835 Hinesburg Road, LLC, FILED. [3472841] [23-218] [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED
2 2 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/27/2023, RECEIVED.[3472872] [23-218] [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:57 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/27/2023, RECEIVED.[3472874] [23-218] [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:58 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant 835 Hinesburg Road, LLC, district court receipt # 366, FILED.[3472875] [23-218] [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]