Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:23-cv-10441
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2023
Re-opened:May 09, 2023
Terminated:Apr 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 1:25 PM EDT
Defendant
Mass Mutual Life Insurance Co.
Represented By
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Vasundhara Prasad
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Keith Patrick Gill
Defendant
MML Investors Services, LLC
Represented By
James R. Carroll
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Vasundhara Prasad
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pro se litigant Douglas Rosenberg
Douglas Rosenberg 12606 Se 42 Street
Bellevue, WA 98006
Represented By
Robert D. Loventhal
Robert D. Loventhal
contact info

GPO Mar 02 2023
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered The motion to file under seal 2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to resubmit the motion and advise the Court whether he wants to proceed if the complaint is not sealed. (PSSA, 4)
GPO Apr 07 2023
Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION entered. Because Plaintiff has not responded to the Courts order, and for the reasons stated in that Order, this action should not be permitted to proceed without further clarification from Plaintiff. Therefore, this court will direct the case to be returned to the Clerk's Office for REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for further proceedings.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommendation: Because Plaintiff failed to respond to the Court's March 2, 2023 Order, and for the reasons stated in that Order, this Court RECOMMENDS to the District Judge to whom this case is reassigned, that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/21/2023(PSSA, 4)
GPO Apr 28 2023
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re 10 Report and Recommendations.This action is dismissed without prejudice. (PSSA, 4)
GPO May 10 2023
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5)
GPO Sep 29 2023
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. Please see attached. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
GPO Feb 05 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.For these reasons, defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 42) is GRANTED.So Ordered.(de Oliveira, Flaviana)
GPO Apr 16 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered GRANTING 77 MOTION to Strike Third Amended Complaint per Rule 12(f) and for failure to comply with Rule 15. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 22, 2024
82 82 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/22 6:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Douglas Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
81 81 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Thu 04/18 5:03 PM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff's First Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No.79 ) is DENIED. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
80 80 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 04/16 11:48 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered GRANTING77 MOTION to Strike Third Amended Complaint per Rule 12(f) and for failure to comply with Rule 15 . (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
Related: [-]