Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Case #: 2:23-cv-00246
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2023
Terminated:Feb 24, 2023
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 22-00002-06416-1 SEA
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 5:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Jane Doe Rootvik
Defendant
Eric Rootvik
15917 WAYNITA WAY NE #E-302
BOTHELL, WA 98011
Defendant
Casework, LLC
Defendant
Passion Works, LLC
Plaintiff
Alastair Bennie
Represented By
Michael B Galletch
Puget Sound Business & Litigation PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 24, 2023
8 8 misc Receipt Mon 03/27 4:25 PM
RECEIPT from King County Superior Court re5 Order to Remand Case. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
7 7 misc Remand Letter Mon 03/13 9:01 AM
LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (SB) (cc: letter, remand order, and docket sheet to King County Superior Court via USPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
6 6 misc Praecipe-Other Fri 02/24 2:12 PM
PRAECIPE re1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (State Court Complaint) by Defendant Eric Rootvik. (SB)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order to Remand Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/24 9:36 AM
ORDER denying Defendant's3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Remanding Matter. The Court ORDERS this matter REMANDED to King County Superior Court because Rootvik's removal was improper. See Acad. of Country Music, 991 F.3d at 1061. And because the Court has no jurisdiction over this matter, it DENIES the Motion to Stay. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 3/13/2023. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) (cc: Defendant via USPS)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter Fri 02/24 8:11 AM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Defendant via USPS) (JWC) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/24/2023) (JWC). Modified on 2/24/2023 to correct form (JWC)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry) Fri 02/24 3:10 PM
***Re-generated NEFs for dkt. nos.4 and5 for Attorney Michael B Galletch after receipt of Defendant's6 PRAECIPE containing State Court complaint. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 02/23 3:21 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Stay of State Court Proceedings), filed by Defendant Eric Rootvik. Noting Date 2/23/2023. (JWC)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/23 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Eric Rootvik. (JWC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Notice of Removal (Copy of State Court Complaint NOT provided),
Att: 2 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet