Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Shalina D Kumar
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 4:23-cv-10449
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 6:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Cratus Medical, PLLC
Represented By
Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Quinn Weight Loss
Represented By
Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Forum Health P.A.
Represented By
Howard W. Burdett, Jr.
Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Enerjeta Jenna Quinn
Represented By
Annemarie Smith-Morris
Salvatore, Prescott, Porter & Porter
contact info
Jennifer B. Salvatore
Salvatore Prescott, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 15, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Fri 03/15 11:41 AM
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
19 19 order Stipulation and Order Wed 02/28 9:30 AM
STIPULATED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME. Closing document dismissing the case with prejudice is due by 3/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
18 18 order Dismissing Case Wed 01/31 12:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 01/16 2:24 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar: Settlement Conference held on 1/16/2024. Disposition: Settlement reached. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (THal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
17 17 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/29 3:16 PM
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ( Settlement Conference set for 1/16/2024 11:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar ). Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 11/29 3:19 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference on 12/6/23 is Cancelled. (THal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
16 16 trial Witness List Wed 11/15 6:54 PM
Plaintiff's WITNESS LIST by Enerjeta Jenna Quinn (Salvatore, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 trial Witness List Wed 11/15 2:05 PM
WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
14 14 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 10/18 2:11 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY. ( Fact Discovery due by 3/29/2024, Expert Discovery due by 5/29/2024 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off reset for 6/29/2024 ). Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
minutes Status Conference Tue 06/13 2:35 PM
Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/13/2023 - (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (CCie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
13 13 notice Appear* Mon 06/05 1:01 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman - ***PLEASE SEE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT CALL-IN INFORMATION*** (CCie)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Protective Order Mon 06/05 12:57 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (CCie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 06/01 4:31 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Discovery to Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appear* Thu 06/01 3:26 PM
**DATE CHANGE** NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference reset for 12/6/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. The parties are to use the call-in information provided in this Notice to join the call. (THal)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appear* Thu 06/01 3:23 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 12/8/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. The parties are to use the call-in information provided in this Notice. (THal)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/01 3:20 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (PHASE I): Status Conference set for 12/6/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2024; Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2024; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. Related [+] (THal)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 05/30 1:19 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 5/31/23 is Cancelled. Scheduling Order to be issued. (THal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 05/18 4:47 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Salvatore, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
6 6 notice Appear* Fri 04/28 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2023 01:00 PM before District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. The parties are to use the call-in information provided in this Notice. (THal)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/21 2:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Burdett, Howard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Wed 03/01 12:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Cratus Medical, PLLC waiver sent on 2/23/2023, answer due 4/24/2023; Dr. Quinn Weight Loss waiver sent on 2/23/2023, answer due 4/24/2023; Forum Health P.A. waiver sent on 2/23/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Salvatore, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/24 9:42 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Cratus Medical, PLLC, Dr. Quinn Weight Loss, Forum Health P.A.* (SKra)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 02/24 9:45 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Annemarie Smith-Morris on behalf of Enerjeta Jenna Quinn. (Smith-Morris, Annemarie)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Enerjeta Jenna Quinn against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9245758 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Salvatore, Jennifer)
Related: [-]