Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:23-cv-00196
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2023
Terminated:May 12, 2023
Case in other court:48th District Court, Tarrant County, TX, 048-338877-22
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 4:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Integrity Trans Inc
5160 West 161st.
Brook Park, OH 44142
Represented By
Michael T Conway
Law Office Of Michael T Conway
contact info
Defendant
Leytarvis Smith
720 Rose Hill Lane
Cedar Hill, TX 75104
Plaintiff
Elena D Holguin
unknown
Glenn Heights, TX 75154
Represented By
Juan C Rodriguez
Law Offices Of Juan C. Rodriguez PLLC
contact info
Jeremy Wayne McKey
Law Offices Of Jeremy W Mckey
contact info
Plaintiff
Johana Acosta Holguin
unknown
Glenn Heights, TX 75154
Represented By
Juan C Rodriguez
Law Offices Of Juan C. Rodriguez PLLC
contact info
Jeremy Wayne McKey
Law Offices Of Jeremy W Mckey
contact info
Plaintiff
Olivia Holguin
unknown
Glenn Heights, TX 75154
Represented By
Juan C Rodriguez
Law Offices Of Juan C. Rodriguez PLLC
contact info
Jeremy Wayne McKey
Law Offices Of Jeremy W Mckey
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, May 12, 2023
17 17 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 05/12 2:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND: Before the Court is a motion to remand (doc.9 ) filed by Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs' motion to remand (doc.9 ) should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the 48th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas. The clerk of this Court is INSTRUCTED to mail a certified copy of this order to the district clerk of Tarrant County, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/12/2023) (fba) (fba)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/12/2023) Additional Page(s) Letter of Remand
Friday, May 05, 2023
16 16 motion Leave to File Fri 05/05 12:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Motion to Remand filed by Elena D Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin, Olivia Holguin (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Affidavit(s),
Att: 3 Affidavit(s),
Att: 4 Affidavit(s),
Att: 5 Affidavit(s)
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
15 15 respm Response/Objection Tue 05/02 7:10 PM
RESPONSE filed by Elena D Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin, Olivia Holguin re:12 MOTION to Strike11 Amended Complaint,, in part combined with Rule 12 (b)(6) motion as to claims against Defendant SMITH (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response/Objection Tue 05/02 7:03 PM
RESPONSE filed by Elena D Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin, Olivia Holguin re:12 MOTION to Strike11 Amended Complaint,, in part combined with Rule 12 (b)(6) motion as to claims against Defendant SMITH (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/11 5:24 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Integrity Trans Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Strike Tue 04/11 5:18 PM
MOTION to Strike11 Amended Complaint,, in part combined with Rule 12 (b)(6) motion as to claims against Defendant SMITH filed by Integrity Trans Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/28 6:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Elena D Holguin, Olivia Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
10 10 respm Reply Thu 03/09 12:57 PM
REPLY filed by Integrity Trans Inc re:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
9 9 motion Remand to State Court Tue 03/07 11:17 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Elena D Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin, Olivia Holguin (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/07 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy Wayne McKey on behalf of Elena D Holguin, Johana Acosta Holguin, Olivia Holguin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McKey, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 03/01 3:05 PM
ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: Having now considered the notice of removal and the attached state-court papers, the Court concludes that Plaintiffs should file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than March 28, 2023. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, which may include the dismissal of Plaintiffs claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/1/2023) (tjc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 03/01 3:07 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Mar 1 15:07:42 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
6 6 qcref Means Fri 02/24 4:50 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (fba)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Transferring to Another Division Fri 02/24 2:45 PM
Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/24/2023) (oyh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 02/24 10:01 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Feb 24 10:01:15 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 02/24 2:50 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Feb 24 14:50:21 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
utility Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (Public Entry) Fri 02/24 3:03 PM
NEW CASE NUMBER 4:23-cv-00196-Y Elena et al v. Integrity Trans Inc et al has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:23cv0427 D. Future filings should reflect only the new case number and be directed to the proper division (see LR 5.1(a)). Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 02/24 4:51 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Feb 24 16:51:42 CST 2023 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
4 4 qcref Fitzwater Fri 02/24 9:38 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION proceed without local counsel filed by Integrity Trans Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Integrity Trans Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Integrity Trans Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number BTXNDC-13542310) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Conway, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 (A) Petition [complaint] and citation [summons] filed in Dist. Ct. Tarrant County,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 (B) Tarrant County Dist Ct. record with Petition amended by Defendant to add numbered paragraphs for making responsive pleading,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2 Integrity Trans Inc authenticated articles for incorporation in Ohio,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Ex. 3 notice of removal to clerk Tarrant County Dist Ct.,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Ex. 4 notice of removal to Plaintiff's counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Ex. 5 notice of removal to Def. Smith,
Att: 7 Cover Sheet civil cover sheet,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) certificate of interested persons
misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 02/24 9:32 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Integrity Trans Inc. (See 1 - 8 for image). (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (mlb)
Related: [-]