New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00141
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 3:07 AM EST
Defendant
JOEL LERNER (1)
Represented By
MELISSA L. JAMPOL
Epstein Becker Green, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
DIANA V. CARRIG
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info

GPO Feb 23 2023
ORDER REGARDING USE OF VIDEO CONFERENCING/TELECONFERENCING FOR FELONY PLEAS AND/OR SENTENCINGS as to JOEL LERNER. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/23/2023. (cds)
GPO Feb 23 2023
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JOEL LERNER (1) 200,000.00 UNSECURED BOND (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/23/2023. (cds)

Docket last updated: 02/25/2023 4:10 AM EST
Thursday, February 23, 2023
1 1 INFORMATION as to JOEL LERNER (1) count(s) 1. (cds)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan D. Wigenton:Initial Appearance as to JOEL LERNER held on 2/23/2023, Bond Hearing as to JOEL LERNER held on 2/23/2023, Plea Agreement Hearing as to JOEL LERNER held on 2/23/2023, Plea entered by JOEL LERNER (1) Guilty Count 1. ( Sentencing set for 7/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference before Judge Susan D. Wigenton.) Unless otherwise advised by this Court, any submissions to be reviewed by the Judge for sentencing must be submitted directly to Chambers in accordance with procedures set forth in Standing Order #20-1. Counsel should be advised that any submissions received after the deadline may not be considered. Further, counsel will be precluded from orally arguing issues set forth in any untimely submissions. (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella (973-776-7753).) (cds)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by JOEL LERNER (cds)
Related: [-]
4 4 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to JOEL LERNER. (cds)
Related: [-]
5 5 PLEA AGREEMENT as to JOEL LERNER (cds)
Related: [-]