Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-00738
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 7:51 AM EDT
Defendant
ROMMEL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT / ROMMEL USA
PO Box 387
Lititz, PA 17543
Represented By
THERESA M. ZECHMAN
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant
THE FARFIELD COMPANY
312 E. Meadow Valley Rd.
Lititz, PA 17543
Represented By
THERESA M. ZECHMAN
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Plaintiff
KATHLEEN LONG
Represented By
ERIC J. STARK
Stark Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 21, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 07/21 1:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON JULY 21, 2023. 7/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Cancelling Deadline ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 07/06 3:06 PM
ORDER OF 7 /6/23 THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 12, 2023 IS CANCELLED. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT ON THE STATUS OF THEIR PENDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TO THE COURT EVERY FRIDAY BY 5:00PM, STARTING JULY 14, 2023. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 7/6/23. 7/6/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
11 11 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/01 3:16 PM
ORDER, ( SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/12/2023 04:00 PM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR..). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/1/23. 6/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES AND E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/01 3:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/7/2023 04:00 PM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR.. DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/30/2023. MOTIONS DUE BY 8/29/2023. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 11/13/2023 09:00 AM IN Cahn 3C BEFORE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON JR... SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/1/23. 6/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 05/31 3:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. Pretrial Conference held on 5/31/23. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/10 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 31, 2023, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. SEE NOTICE FOR CALL-IN INFORMATION.(dja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 05/03 2:27 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ROMMEL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT / ROMMEL USA, THE FARFIELD COMPANY.(ZECHMAN, THERESA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/02 3:33 PM
ORDER OF 5/2/23 THAT IT APPEARING TO THE COURT THAT DEFENDANTS HAVE NOT FILED THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT REQUIRED BY FRCP 7.1 AT THE TIME OF FILING THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE. DEFENDANTS ARE HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE THEIR DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 5/2/23. 5/2/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/01 10:43 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer And Affirmative Defenses In Response To Plaintiff's Complaint by ROMMEL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT / ROMMEL USA, THE FARFIELD COMPANY.(ZECHMAN, THERESA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/06 1:39 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN LONG. All Defendants. (STARK, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/07 4:24 PM
INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 3/7/23. 3/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 26, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 02/27 10:19 AM
Summons Issued as to ROMMEL CAPITAL MANAGEMENT / ROMMEL USA, THE FARFIELD COMPANY. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/27/23 (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Sun 02/26 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16523688.), filed by KATHLEEN C. LONG.(STARK, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form
misc Jury Demand Mon 02/27 10:20 AM
Jury Trial Demanded by Plaintiff KATHLEEN LONG. (dt)
Related: [-]