Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:23-cv-00229
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 26, 2023 12:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Cogent Communications, Inc.
Jackson Lewis P.C. 93 Red River Street Suite 1150
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Mitchell F. Boomer
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jheris Jordan
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley Iles
Represented By
Dennis L Richard
The Law Office Of Dennis L. Richard
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/23 10:48 AM
Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 01/23 9:51 AM
Text Order MOOTING16 Motion for Summary Judgment in light of Agreed Dismissal by the parties (Dkt. # 29). Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Wed 01/22 3:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Cogent Communications, Inc..(Boomer, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
26 26 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 01/08 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dustin M. Howell: Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2025. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically) (Court Reporter web ex.)(cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/10 2:26 PM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 1/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 12/09 4:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and FINALLY ORDERED that the zoom hearing scheduled for Thursday, December 12, 2024, at 10am is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 01/23 10:50 AM
Motion No Longer Referred:20 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 12/06 12:00 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Bradley Iles . (Richard, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 11/18 2:40 PM
ORDER SETTING HEARING by Zoom for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 notice Notice Thu 11/14 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Cogent Communications, Inc. re20 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/07 9:52 AM
Text Order REFERRING20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney to Magistrate Judge Howell. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 11/07 3:29 PM
MOTION REFERRED: referred20 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Referral Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
20 20 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 11/06 8:31 AM
Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bradley Iles.(Richard, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/13 4:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Cogent Communications, Inc., re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Cogent Communications, Inc.(Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3a,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4a,
Att: 3 Exhibit 6,
Att: 4 Exhibit 7,
Att: 5 Declaration of Jheris Jordan in Support
Thursday, June 06, 2024
18 18 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/06 9:03 AM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Bradley Iles, re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Cogent Communications, Inc.(Richard, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Friday, May 24, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/24 5:24 PM
Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Boomer, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/24 5:22 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cogent Communications, Inc..(Boomer, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jheris Jordan,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Jonah Naulls,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel Soto,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Bradley Iles,
Att: 5 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Corey Hawthorne,
Att: 6 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Carol Murillo
Thursday, March 07, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 03/07 9:42 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 9/13/2023, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/8/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2023, Discovery due by 4/26/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2023, and Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2024. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
14 14 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 03/06 11:38 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Cogent Communications, Inc..(Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/08 11:02 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 9/13/2023, ADR Report Deadline due by 12/8/2023,, Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2023, Discovery due by 3/8/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2023, and Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2024. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
12 12 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/05 8:50 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Cogent Communications, Inc..(Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 07, 2023
11 11 adr ADR Report - Other Thu 12/07 2:54 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Cogent Communications, Inc.(Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
10 10 trial Expert Witness List Thu 12/07 2:39 PM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 07/17 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell F. Boomer on behalf of Cogent Communications, Inc. (Boomer, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/19 2:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2023, Discovery due by 1/8/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 10/9/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2024. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
7 7 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 05/02 1:19 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 04/21 2:07 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/10 2:15 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/01 10:58 AM
ORDER pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(b), that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings.. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
3 3 misc Supplement to Tue 02/28 10:29 AM
SUPPLEMENT JS44 - Amended by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Tue 02/28 10:28 AM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Cogent Communications, Inc.. (Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/27 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cogent Communications, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ATXWDC-17132405), filed by Cogent Communications, Inc..(Jordan, Jheris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 18 pgs Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/01 10:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 03/01 10:12 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (rn) Modified on 3/1/2023 (rn)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 03/01 10:16 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bradley Iles. (rn)
Related: [-]