Tiffany Neal v. US
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01033
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv.us-01206 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 3:22 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
TIFFANY NEAL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/21/2023 3:21 AM EST |
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01033-MJM. Case manager: TBarton. [1001322838] 23-1206 TB [Entered: 02/27/2023 10:01 AM] | |
2 | 2 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Andrew Nyombi re: change of address. [1001322886] 23-1206 TB [Entered: 02/27/2023 10:19 AM] | |
3 | 3 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01033-MJM. Mailed to: Onyebuchim Chinwah. [1001322891] 23-1206 TB [Entered: 02/27/2023 10:20 AM] |