California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00640
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 01, 2023 12:37 AM PST
Defendant
Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (1)
Represented By
Daniel T. Lee
Federal Defenders
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Edward Chang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 3:07 PM PST
Friday, February 24, 2023
Arrest of Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (no document attached) (mtb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia.(mtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia: Initial Appearance set for 2/27/2023 before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Initial Appearance as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia held on 2/27/2023. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia. Detention Hearing as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia held on 2/27/2023. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion denied as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia. Bond set as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and $1,500 cash deposit. Rule 5 advisement provided. (Preliminary Hearing set for 3/9/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 3/21/23 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.) (Interpreter Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 2/27/2023 AHG 23-1:1:35-1:56). (Plaintiff Attorney Alexander Kristofcak AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carmel Abuzaid FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 2/28/2023 (aje).
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER as to Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/27/23. (aje)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and $1,500 cash deposit... Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/27/2023. (cxl)
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Cesar Ivan Ayala Garcia (cxl)
Related: [-]