California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:23-cv-00909
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 27, 2023 2:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Biogen MA, Inc.
Represented By
Charles Hsu
Dechert LLP
contact info
Katherine Ann Helm
Dechert LLP
contact info
Martin Jay Black
Dechert LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Genentech, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Anna Howard
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Jeffrey E. Faucette
Skaggs Faucette LLP
contact info
Natalie A. Komrovsky
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Renee M. Griffin
Williams & Connolly
contact info
Thomas S Fletcher
Williams And Connolly
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 05/09 5:45 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 05/09 12:05 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Biogen MA, Inc... (Hsu, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/09 12:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Biogen MA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Biogen Inc. for Biogen MA, Inc.. (Hsu, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/09 11:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Martin J. Black ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18246148.) filed by Biogen MA, Inc.. (Black, Martin)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/09 11:39 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Katherine A. Helm ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18246037.) filed by Biogen MA, Inc.. (Helm, Katherine)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/09 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hsu (Hsu, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/04 12:52 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Genentech, Inc... (Faucette, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 03/21 1:59 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2023 . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 03/01 1:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Biogen MA, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 03/01 1:13 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2023 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 03/01 11:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/28 7:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Genentech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Roche Holdings, Inc. for Genentech, Inc.. (Faucette, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/28 6:26 PM
Proposed Summons. (Faucette, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/28 6:23 PM
COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract against Biogen MA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18030662.). Filed byGenentech, Inc..(Faucette, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet