Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-56521

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:23-ap-05028
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2023
Terminated:Mar 16, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert H McClure
2350 Bentley Trail
Loganville, GA 30052
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer LLC
contact info
G. Frank Nason, IV
Lamberth, Cifelli, Ellis & Nason, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Smith Bailey/ RH McClure, Inc.
1000 McRee Road
Jefferson, GA 30549
Represented By
Smith Bailey/ RH McClure, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtney Cheek
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Weinstein & Black, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, March 16, 2023
misc Adversary Closed Thu 03/16 8:16 AM
Adversary 1:23-ap-5028 Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
3 3 motion Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary, Motion for Wed 03/15 10:17 AM
Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary filed by Michael B. Weinstein on behalf of Courtney Cheek. (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/01 11:34 AM
Summons Issued on Robert H McClure Answer Due 03/31/2023 (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/28 5:56 PM
Adversary case 23-05028 Complaint against Robert H McClure, Smith Bailey/ RH McClure, Inc. , Fee Collected $ 350 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) Filed by Courtney Cheek, Robert H McClure (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit