Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-12346

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lashonda A Hunt
Case #: 1:23-ap-00046
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
EMVLP LLC d/b/a STATE FARM BANK
ONE STATE FARM PLAZA, SUITE D3
BLOOMINGTON, IL 61710
Represented By
EMVLP LLC d/b/a STATE FARM BANK
contact info
Plaintiff
Zane Zielinski as Chapter 7 Trustee
Law Offices of Zane L. Zielinski PC 6336 N. Cicero Suite 201
Chicago, IL 60646
Represented By
Daniel J Nickel
Daniel J Nickel Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
14 14 court Receipt for Full Payment of Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/06 7:50 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by TM. Receipt Number 3246116. Payment received from Zane L Zielinski, Trustee. Related [+]
Related: [-] gister
Friday, May 05, 2023
13 13 order Joint Fri 05/05 4:12 PM
(E)Order Withdrawing Motion to Join Related [+]. Signed on 05/05/2023. (Keith-Anderson, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 7
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/05 3:35 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-46 Closed . (Cabrales, Claudia)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 05/05 3:31 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice. Signed on 5/5/2023 (Cabrales, Claudia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
10 10 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/03 1:29 PM
Proposed Order - Dismissing Case Filed by Daniel J Nickel on behalf of Zane Zielinski as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Nickel, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Motion to Join/Joinder of Parties
Friday, April 21, 2023
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 04/21 3:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 719, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Hunt.. Signed on 04/21/2023. (Keith-Anderson, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 7 Join/Joinder of Parties
Friday, April 14, 2023
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 04/14 12:14 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 09:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 719, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Hunt.. Signed on 04/14/2023. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 13, 2023
7 7 motion Join/Joinder of Parties Thu 04/13 8:29 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Join Related [+] Filed by Nathan E Curtis on behalf of Caleb Matthew Swartz. Hearing scheduled for 4/21/2023 at 09:15 AM at Appear In Courtroom 719, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Hunt. (Curtis, Nathan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
6 6 misc Appearance Wed 04/12 3:32 PM
Appearance Filed by Michael Poncin on behalf of EMVLP LLC d/b/a STATE FARM BANK. (Poncin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
5 5 utility U - Corrective Entry Fri 03/03 3:48 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: to correct docket text Related [+]. (Gomez, Denise)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Service Executed
Thursday, March 02, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/02 11:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on Zane Zielinski as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Nickel, Daniel)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
3 3 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Thu 03/02 11:08 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Daniel J Nickel on behalf of Zane Zielinski as Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Nickel, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/01 8:55 AM
Summons Issued on EMVLP LLC d/b/a STATE FARM BANK Answer Due 03/31/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/01 8:55 AM
Adversary case 23-00046 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Zane Zielinski as Chapter 7 Trustee against EMVLP LLC d/b/a STATE FARM BANK. (ApFee Deferred) Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 4/14/2023 at 09:15 AM at Appear In Courtroom 719, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Hunt. (Nickel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Payments and State Farm Statement
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Debtor's Bank Statement