Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:23-cv-00454
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:Aug 10, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2023 7:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Good Food Creations, LLC
Represented By
Key Morrow
Cole, Scott, & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Marie Prats
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Eric Brian Moody
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Lacassin
Represented By
Key Morrow
Cole, Scott, & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Marie Prats
Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,
contact info
Eric Brian Moody
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Abigail Herrin
Represented By
Craig L. Berman
Berman Law Firm, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, September 15, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 09/15 9:51 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Abigail Herrin (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 08/10 3:08 PM
ORDER granting 24 --motion to approve settlement; approving the settlement; dismissing the action with prejudice; directing the clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/10/2023. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
24 24 motion Settlement Wed 08/09 2:43 PM
MOTION for Settlement by Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin.(Moody, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
23 23 adr Mediation report Wed 06/28 5:49 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 27, 2023. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
22 22 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 06/15 1:44 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final pretrial conference scheduled for 4/29/2024 at 10:00AM in Tampa Courtroom 12B before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite; jury trial set for the MAY 2024 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/15/2023. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 06/02 10:24 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 27, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Carlos Burruezo. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
20 20 misc Case Management Report Mon 05/22 12:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/26 4:35 PM
NOTICE by Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 (Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/25 11:20 AM
ORDER granting 12 --motion to withdraw; withdrawing Alicia H. Koepke and Jacqueline M. Prats as counsel for the defendants; directing the clerk to terminate Koepke and Prats from the service list. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/25/2023. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/24 11:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Good Food Creations, LLC. (Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 04/21 4:25 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin. Related case(s): No (Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/12 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Brian Moody on behalf of Good Food Creations, LLC (Moody, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 04/11 9:21 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/10 5:41 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin.(Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/07 12:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Trenam Law to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (Prats, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Thu 04/06 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Key Morrow on behalf of Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin (Morrow, Key)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/27 4:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendants' unopposed motion (Doc. 9 ) is GRANTED. The defendants must respond to the complaint not later than APRIL 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/27/2023. (KRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/24 1:55 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Prats, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 03/07 12:50 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Abigail Herrin. Related case(s): No (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/07 12:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Abigail Herrin. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons returned executed Tue 03/07 11:47 AM
RETURN of service executed on March 6, 2023 by Abigail Herrin as to Kevin Lacassin. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons returned executed Tue 03/07 11:46 AM
RETURN of service executed on March 6, 2023 by Abigail Herrin as to Good Food Creations, LLC. (Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons issued Thu 03/02 8:59 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Good Food Creations, LLC, Kevin Lacassin. (MCB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/02 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-0454-SDM-CPT. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/01 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20563303) filed by Abigail Herrin.(Berman, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/01 4:09 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:23-cv-0454-SDM-CPT. (SJB)
Related: [-]