Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:23-cv-00367
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Terminated:Jun 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday Aug 28, 2023 4:24 AM MST
Consol Plaintiff
Seth Van Dorn
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info
Susan Joan Martin
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Adam Bain
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Cipora Herman
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Jaffe
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Pueo Keffer
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Jason Kilar
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Opendoor Technologies Incorporated
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
John Rice
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Glenn Solomon
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Carrie Wheeler
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Defendant
Eric Wu
Represented By
Lyle Roberts
Shearman & Sterling Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam S Hakki
Shearman & Sterling Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
John Christopher Gray
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie Llp - Phoenix Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Carlson
Represented By
Barry Gainey
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info
Gregory M Egleston
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info
Seth D Rigrodsky
Rigrodsky Law PA
contact info
Robert Schupler
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info
Timothy John MacFall
Rigrodsky Law PA
contact info
Gerald Barrett
Ward Keenan Barrett Pc - Central Ave Phoenix
contact info
Timothy J MacFall
Rigrodsky Law PA
contact info
Thomas James McKenna
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info
David Silva
Gainey Mckenna & Egleston
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, June 22, 2023
24 24 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/22 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal23 . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Thu 06/22 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ryan Carlson, Seth Van Dorn. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/31 5:18 PM
ORDER denying21 Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 5/31/2023. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
21 21 motion Stay Mon 05/22 9:44 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Ryan Carlson.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 19, 2023
20 20 misc Statement Fri 05/19 12:03 PM
STATEMENT of Designation of Operative Complaint by Plaintiff Ryan Carlson. (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 05/16 12:42 PM
ORDER denying18 Stipulation re Stay of Proceedings. See order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 5/15/2023. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 05/12 1:02 PM
STIPULATION re:16 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Stay of Proceedings by Ryan Carlson.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 05/09 2:02 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lyle Roberts on behalf of Defendants Adam Bain, Cipora Herman, Jonathan Jaffe, Pueo Keffer, Jason Kilar, Opendoor Technologies Incorporated, John Rice, Glenn Solomon, Carrie Wheeler, Eric Wu. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 05/08 11:39 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Adam S Hakki on behalf of Defendants Adam Bain, Cipora Herman, Jonathan Jaffe, Pueo Keffer, Jason Kilar, Opendoor Technologies Incorporated, John Rice, Glenn Solomon, Carrie Wheeler, Eric Wu. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Fri 05/05 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Gray on behalf of Adam Bain, Cipora Herman, Jonathan Jaffe, Pueo Keffer, Jason Kilar, Opendoor Technologies Incorporated, John Rice, Glenn Solomon, Carrie Wheeler, Eric Wu. (Gray, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/04 8:14 AM
ORDER affirming Hon. G. Murray Snow's Order of March 20, 2023 (Doc.9 ), wherein the Court ordered "10. Plaintiffs shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, file a consolidated complaint, which will be the operative complaint in the Consolidated Derivative Action. Defendants need not respond to the prior complaint filed in the Related Derivative Actions." Plaintiffs not having complied with the Court's order, IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until 5/12/23 to comply with the previous court's order by filing a consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/3/23. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/03 9:52 AM
AMENDED ORDER TO TRANSFER - IT IS ORDERED that case number 2:23-CV-00367-GMS, consolidated with 2:23-CV-455-DMF, is hereby transferred to the Hon. Michael T. Liburdi, before whom the above related earlier-filed securities class action is pending, for all purposes, including trial. All future pleadings in the transferred action shall bear the following caption: In re Opendoor Technologies Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation, No. 2:23-CV-00367-MTL. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/3/23. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case Tue 05/02 3:50 PM
ORDER granting (42) Motion to Transfer Related Case in case 2:22-cv-01717-MTL; granting13 Motion to Transfer Related Case. in case 2:23-cv-00367-GMS; granting8 Motion to Transfer Related Case. in case 2:23-cv-00455-GMS. Case number 2:23-CV-00367-GMS, consolidated with 2:23-CV-455-DMF, is hereby transferred to the Hon. Michael T. Liburdi, before whom the above related earlier-filed securities class action is pending, for all purposes, including trial. All future pleadings in this consolidated action shall bear the following caption: In re Opendoor Technologies Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 2:22-CV 01717-MTL. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/2/23. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01717-MTL, 2:23-cv-00367-GMS, 2:23-cv-00455-GMS) (SMF)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 05/02 1:53 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gregory M Egleston on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Carlson, Consol Plaintiff Seth Van Dorn. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
13 13 motion Transfer Related Case Mon 05/01 4:35 PM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Ryan Carlson. **Redocket by the Clerk for statistical purposes. (Associated Cases: CV 23-00367 PHX-GMS, CV 23-00455 PHX-GMS, CV 22-01717 PHX-MTL) (DXD) *Modified filed date on 5/1/2023 (DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Transfer Related Case Fri 04/28 10:50 AM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Seth Van Dorn, Ryan Carlson. (Associated Cases: CV 23-00367 PHX-GMS,CV 23-00455 PHX-DMF) (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order To Transfer Pursuant to LRCiv 42.1
Monday, April 24, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/24 12:56 PM
ORDER - Before the Court is a Stipulation Regarding Re-Assignment (Doc.10 ). The Stipulation is denied for the parties' failure to comply with LRCiv 42.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/24/23. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 04/20 5:43 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Re-Assignment by Ryan Carlson.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Re-Assignment
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
misc Remark (Public) Wed 04/19 3:04 PM
Remark: Out of state attorneys Gregory Michael Egleston and Thomas James McKenna terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
misc Remark (Public) Wed 04/05 8:32 AM
Remark: Out of state attorneys Barry Gainey, David Silva, and Robert Schupler terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
ORDER granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:23-cv-00367-GMS. The Related Derivative Actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), under Case No. Case No.: 2:23-cv-00367-GMS (the "Consolidated Derivative Action"). Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action, or in any separate action included herein, must bear the above caption. Rigrodsky Law, P.A. and Gainey McKenna & Egleston are hereby designated as Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel for the conduct of the Consolidated Derivative Action. Plaintiffs shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, file a consolidated complaint, which will be the operative complaint in the Consolidated Derivative Action. Defendants need not respond to the prior complaints filed in the Related Derivative Actions. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/20/23. (Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00367-GMS, 2:23-cv-00455-DMF) (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
8 8 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 03/21 3:26 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ryan Carlson. (Associated Cases: CV-23-367-PHX-GMS, CV-23-455-PHX-DMF) (NOTE: This entry was re-docketed for statistical purposes using the proper LR 42 Motion to Consolidate Event)(SMF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 03/17 2:27 PM
STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Cases and Appoint Lead Counsel by Ryan Carlson.(Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 16, 2023
misc Remark (Public) Thu 03/16 7:39 AM
Remark: Out of state attorney Seth D Rigrodsky terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 03/08 2:59 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Timothy J MacFall on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Carlson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Thu 03/02 4:38 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/2/2023. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/02 4:35 PM
ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 31, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/2/2023. (KFZ)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 03/02 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Adam Bain, Cipora Herman, Jonathan Jaffe, Pueo Keffer, Jason Kilar, Opendoor Technologies Incorporated, John Rice, Glenn Solomon, Carrie Wheeler, Eric Wu.(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 03/02 9:39 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21651973. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 23-0367 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Thu 03/02 9:32 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Carlson. (Barrett, Gerald)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/02 9:17 AM
VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21651973 filed by Ryan Carlson. (Barrett, Gerald)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Verification - Carlson